Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 66689
Short Caption:PARAMETRIC SOUND CORP. VS. DIST. CT. (RAKAUSKAS)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):75608
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A686890Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus/Prohibition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:09/01/2015 at 2:00 PMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:09/01/2015How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/14/2014Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $250.00 from Kelly H. Dove.
10/14/2014Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus or, in the Alternative, Writ of Prohibition.14-34129
10/14/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 1.14-34131
10/14/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 2.14-34132
10/14/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 3.14-34133
10/16/2014MotionFiled Motion to File Petitionsers' Appendix Under Seal. (DETACHED EXHIBITS FIVE AND SIX AND FILED UNDER SEAL PER ORDER OF 11/26/14).14-34516
11/26/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer and Granting Motion to Seal. Real parties in interest's answer to writ petition due: 30 days. Petitioners: 15 days to file any reply. We grant petitioners' motion as to the motion to dismiss and the related reply. The clerk of this court shall return, unfiled, the appendix volume received on October 22 and petitioners shall have five days to resubmit two appendices to replace this volume. The first appendix, which shall be filed under seal, shall contain unredacted copies of petitioners' district court motion to dismiss and their reply to the opposition to that motion. The second appendix, which will not be sealed, shall contain all documents from the proposed appendix for which sealing was not requested along with a redacted copy of the reply to the opposition to the motion to dismiss. The clerk of this court shall seal exhibits five and six to petitioners' October 16 motion.14-38970
11/26/2014Other Incoming DocumentFiled Exhibits 5 and 6 (SEALED - detached from motion filed 10/16/14).
12/08/2014AppendixFiled Petitioner's Appendix Volume 1 (1 of 2)14-39887
12/08/2014AppendixFiled Petitioners' Appendix Volume 1 (part 2 of 2)14-39888
12/08/2014AppendixFiled Petitioners' Appendix Volume 2 (part 1 of 2)14-39889
12/08/2014AppendixFiled Petitioners' Appendix Volume 2 (part 2 of 2)14-39891
12/08/2014AppendixFiled Petitioner's Appendix Volume 3.14-39892
12/09/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ. Volumes 1-3. (SEALED Copy)
12/23/2014MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Time to File Answering Brief (First Request)14-42001
01/09/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Approving Stipulation for Extension of Time. Real parties in interest shall therefore have until January 16, 2015, to file and serve the answer, and petitioners shall have until February 23, 2015, to file and serve any reply.15-00990
01/16/2015MotionFiled Motion to File Real Party in Interest's Answering Brief Under Seal.15-01747
02/17/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion to Seal. The clerk of this court shall file the answer received on January 21, 2015. Petitioners shall have until February 23, 2015, to file and serve any reply.15-05088
02/17/2015Petition/WritFiled Answer of Real Parties in Interest to the Petition for Writ of Mandamus or, in the Alternative, Writ of Prohibition.15-05106
02/24/2015Petition/WritFiled Petitioners' Reply Brief in Support of Petition for Writ of Mandamus, or, in the alternative, Writ of Prohibition.15-05802
05/18/2015MotionFiled Petitioners' Emergency Motion to Stay District Court Proceedings Pending Appeal Relief Requested by May 26, 2015.15-15264
05/19/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Errata to Petitioners' Emergency Motion to Stay District Court Proceedings Pending Appeal Relief Requested by May 26, 2015.15-15355
05/20/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion for Stay.15-15461
07/28/2015Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar.15-22773
07/30/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Tuesday, September 1, 2015, at 2:00 p.m. for 30 minutes in Carson City.15-23086
08/18/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.15-24951
08/26/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Filing Copy of Pro Hac Vice Orders Pursuant to NRAP 46(a)(3). Randall J. Baron of Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd, LLP, David A. Knotts of Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd, LLP, and Jonathan M. Stein of Saxena White, PA.15-25844
08/26/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Filing Copy of Pro Hac Vice Orders Pursuant to NRAP 46(a)(3). Neil Steiner, Joshua Hess and Brian Raphel.15-25903
08/28/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Filing Order Granting Motion to Associate Counsel, John Peter Stigi III, for Defendants, Kenneth Potashner, Elwood Norris,Seth Putternman, Robert Kaplan, Andrew Wolfe and James Honore.15-26122
09/01/2015Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision before the En Banc Court.
09/03/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order for Supplemental Briefing and Inviting Participation by Amicus Curiae. Petitioners' Supplemental Brief due: 15 days. Respondents' Supplemental Brief due: 15 days from service of Petitioners' Supp. Brief. The Business Law Section of the State Bar of Nevada is invited to submit an amicus brief: due 45 days.15-26809
09/17/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Address. (Real Parties in Interest Attorneys/Saxena White PA)15-28172
09/18/2015BriefFiled Petitioners' Supplemental Brief in Support of Petition for Writ of Mandamus, or, in the Alternative, Writ of Prohibition.15-28375
09/21/2015Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Supplemental Brief due: October 12, 2015.15-28515
10/13/2015BriefFiled Supplemental Brief of Real Party In Interest.15-31037
10/13/2015AppendixFiled Real Parties In Interest Appendix Vol. I.15-31038
10/13/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Certificate of Compliance (Supplemental Brief of Real Parties in Interest).15-31087
10/16/2015MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time to File and Serve Amicus Brief Pursuant to NRAP 31.15-31644
10/23/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Business Law Section of the State Bar of Nevada's Amicus Brief due: December 3, 2015.15-32431
12/03/2015BriefFiled Amicus Brief of Amicus Curiae Business Law Section of the State Bar of Nevada.15-36945
05/09/2017BriefFiled Petitioners' Notice of Supplemental Authority.17-15296
05/23/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Response of Real Parties in Interst to Petitioners' Notice of Supplemental Authority.17-17230
05/23/2017BriefFiled Notice of Supplemental Authorities by Real Parties in Interest.17-17231
05/24/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Errata to Notice of Supplemental Authority by Real Parties in Interest.17-17379
05/26/2017BriefFiled Petitioners' Response to Real Parties in Interest's Notice of Supplemental Authority.17-17835
09/14/2017Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Petition granted." We direct the clerk of this court to issue a writ of mandamus directing the district court to dismiss the complaint without prejudice to the shareholders' ability to file and amended complaint.Fn1[The Honorable Lidia S. Stiglich, Justice, did not participate in the decision of this matter.] Before the Court En Banc. Author: Hardesty, J. Majority: Hardesty/Cherry/Douglas/Gibbons/Pickering/Parraguirre. 133 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 59. EN BANC17-31061
09/14/2017WritIssued Writ with letter. Original and one copy of writ and copy of the order mailed to Attorney Kelly Dove for service upon Judge Elizabeth Goff Gonzalez.17-31102
09/20/2017WritFiled Returned Writ. Original Writ returned. Served on Judge Elizabeth Goff Gonzalez on September 18, 2017.17-31851
10/09/2017RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur.17-34107
10/09/2017Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.