The Supreme Court
of Nevada
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 66697
Short Caption:MCNEILL (STEVE) VS. STATEClassification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Direct
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C297725Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Disqualifications:Panel Assigned: En Banc
Replacement:
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:04/04/2016 at 10:00 AMOral Argument Location:Regional Justice Center
Submission Date:04/04/2016How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/16/2014Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
10/16/2014Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Filed certified copy of notice of appeal. (Fast Track Notice issued to counsel for appellant.)14-34387
10/23/2014TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter Kiara Schmidt stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 5/7/14.14-35467
11/25/2014MotionFiled Motion for Extension to File FTS.14-38804
12/04/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion and Re: Transcript Request Form. Appellant's fast track statement and appendix due: January 9, 2015. Transcript request form addressed to court reporter Dana Tavaglione due: 11 days.14-39471
12/04/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Re: Transcripts. Court reporter Brenda Schroeder's certificate due: 14 days. Fn1[A copy of the transcript request form is attached.] Fn2[If Ms. Schroeder believes she is not responsible for filing and delivering the requested transcripts, she shall inform this court in writing within 7 days from the date of this order.]14-39472
12/08/2014Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 7/9/14. To Court Reporter: Dana J. Tavaglione.14-39844
12/11/2014MotionFiled Request for Extension of Time to File Transcripts.14-40386
12/12/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Court Reporter Brenda Schroeder's Certificate of Delivery of Transcripts due: January 20, 2015. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: February 19, 2015.14-40615
12/29/2014TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Dana J. Tavaglione stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 7/9/2014.14-42255
01/13/2015TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter Brenda Schroeder stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 6/30/14, 7/7/14, 7/8/14, 7/30/14 and 9/10/14.15-01309
01/27/2015Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. (Second NOA).15-02907
02/19/2015MotionFiled Motion for Full Briefing or Alternatively Motion for Extension to File Fast Track Statement.15-05421
02/27/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's motion for full briefing is granted. Opening Brief and Appendix due: 30 days.15-06270
03/30/2015MotionFiled Stipulation to File Opening Brief.15-09573
03/30/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Opening Brief and Appendix due: April 29, 2015.15-09581
04/30/2015BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.15-13108
04/30/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief, Vol. 1.15-13109
04/30/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief, Vol. 215-13110
04/30/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief, Vol. 3.15-13111
06/01/2015MotionFiled Motion for Enlargement of Time (Answering Brief).15-16620
06/01/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Answering Brief due: July 1, 2015.15-16630
07/01/2015MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time - Second Request (Answering Brief).15-20120
07/10/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Answering Brief due: July 31, 2015.15-21011
07/31/2015MotionFiled Motion for Enlargement of Time Third Request (Answering Brief).15-23282
08/07/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Answering Brief due: August 31, 2015.15-23895
08/28/2015BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.15-26214
09/24/2015MotionFiled Stipulation to File Reply Brief. (30 day extension)15-28865
09/24/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Reply brief due date: October 28, 2015.15-28987
10/29/2015BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.15-33010
10/29/2015Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
02/02/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This court has determined that oral argument may be of assistance in resolving this matter. Accordingly, this matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar.16-03482
02/03/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Monday, April 4, 2016, at 10:00 am for 30 minutes in Las Vegas.16-03665
03/21/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.16-08819
04/04/2016Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court.
07/28/2016Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Reversed and remanded." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Douglas, J. Majority: Douglas/Parraguirre/hardesty/Cherry/Saitta/Gibbons/Pickering. 132 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 54. EN BANC16-23421
08/22/2016RemittiturIssued Remittitur.16-25925
08/22/2016Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
09/15/2016RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on August 29, 2016.16-25925
11/07/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter to Publishers regarding Corrections to recently filed opinions. Nos. 67656/64349;64452;65497/64702;65007;65172/65562/66697/66157/67660/56329/69169 (Filed in docket no. 67656 document no. 16-34632)