The Supreme Court
of Nevada
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Administrative Case: ADKT 0501
Short Caption:IN RE: AMENDMENT OF THE NEVADA RULES OF APPELLATE PROCEDUREClassification:Administrative - ADKT - ADKT
Case Status:Scheduled for Hearing
Filed Date:11/24/2014Public Hearing:12/04/2014 at 2:00 PM (Regional Justice Center, Las Vegas)
09/06/2018 at 12:00 PM (Nevada Supreme Court Courtroom, Carson City)
11/05/2018 at 3:00 PM (Nevada Supreme Court Courtroom, Carson City)
Closed Date:10/14/2016

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/24/2014Administrative CaseFiled Petition.14-38594
11/25/2014Administrative CaseFiled Order Setting Public Hearing for Thursday, December 4, 2014, at 2:00 pm in the Nevada Supreme Court Courtroom, Regional Justice Center (videoconferenced to Courtroom in Carson City). Comment deadline: December 3, 2014 @ 5:00 pm. A copy of the proposed rule amendments may be obtained from the Supreme Court Clerk's Office or downloaded from the Supreme Court's website (http://www.supreme.nvcourts.gov/).14-38899
12/03/2014Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Jonell Thomas with the Office of the Special Public Defender. (via-fax)14-39381
12/03/2014Administrative CaseFiled Comments from attorney's Franny Forsman and John Lambrose. (via-fax)14-39398
12/03/2014Administrative CaseFiled Comments from attorney Rhonda L. Mushkin. (via-fax)14-39405
12/03/2014Administrative CaseFiled Comments from the Law Firm Holland & Hart.14-39406
12/03/2014Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Liaison Committee, Appellate Litigation Section of the State Bar of Nevada.14-39407
12/03/2014Administrative CaseFiled Comments from the Law Firm Gordon Silver.14-39412
12/03/2014Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Rene Valladares with the Federal Public Defender's Office. (Via-fax)14-39418
12/04/2014Administrative CasePublic Hearing Held. Public Hearing held on the Administrative Docket. Before the En Banc Court.
12/05/2014Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Rene Valladares with the Federal Public Defender's Office. (via-mail)14-39612
12/08/2014Administrative CaseFiled Comments from attorney Rhonda L. Mushkin. (via-mail)14-39779
12/08/2014Administrative CaseFiled Comments from attorney's Franny Forsman and John Lambrose. (via-mail)14-39780
12/08/2014Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Jonell Thomas with the Office of the Special Public Defender. (via-mail)14-39919
12/18/2014Administrative CaseFiled Order Amending the Nevada Rules of Appellate Procedure (Exhibit A attached). Amendments shall be effective 30 days from the date of this order, and shall apply to all appeals docketed in the Nevada Supreme Court of Appeals on or after that date.14-41315
04/28/2015Case Status UpdateCase Closed.
10/12/2016Administrative CaseCase Reopened.
10/12/2016Administrative CaseFiled Order Amending Nevada Rules of Appellate Procedure 17 and 21. Exhibits A and B attached. Effective on January 1, 2017.16-31866
10/14/2016Administrative CaseCase Closed.
07/20/2018Administrative CaseCase Reopened.
07/20/2018Administrative CaseFiled Petition.18-27811
07/23/2018Administrative CaseFiled Order Scheduling Public Hearing and Requesting Public Comment. Proposed amendments are attached. Hearing to be held Thursday, September 6, 2018, at 12:00 p.m. in the Supreme Court Courtroom in Carson City. Videoconferenced to Las Vegas Courtroom. Comments due to Clerk by 5:00 p.m. on August 30, 2018. Persons interested in participating must notify the Clerk no later than August 30, 2018.18-28112
08/24/2018Administrative CaseFiled Petition.18-33195
08/31/2018Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Pat Lundwall and Debbie Leonard with McDonald Carano.18-34207
09/06/2018Administrative CasePublic Hearing Held. Public Hearing held on the Administrative Docket.
09/18/2018Administrative CaseFiled Letter from Sheri Thome and Michael P Lowry with Wilson Elser regarding petition filed on August 24, 2018.18-36436
09/21/2018Administrative CaseFiled Order Amending Nevada Rule of Appellate Procedure 17. Exhibit A attached. Effective 30 days from the date of this order.18-37021
10/10/2018Administrative CaseFiled Order Scheduling Public Hearing and Requesting Public Comment. Proposed amendments are attached. Hearing to be held Monday, November 5, 2018, at 3:00 p.m. in the Supreme Court Courtroom in Carson City. Videoconferenced to Las Vegas Courtroom. Comments due to Clerk by 5:00 p.m. on October 24, 2018. Persons interested in participating must notify the Clerk no later than October 24, 2018.18-39841