The Supreme Court
of Nevada
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 66761
Short Caption:NATIONSTAR MORTG. VS. RODRIGUEZClassification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A685616Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Disqualifications:Panel Assigned: En Banc
Replacement:
To SP/Judge:10/29/2014 / Boyer, JohnSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:04/04/2016 at 10:30 AMOral Argument Location:Regional Justice Center
Submission Date:04/04/2016How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/23/2014Filing FeeFiling fee due for Appeal. Filing fee will be forwarded by the District Court.
10/23/2014Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)14-35447
10/23/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed.14-35450
10/27/2014Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Kravitz, Schnitzer & Johnson, CHTD. Check No. 308551.
10/29/2014Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: John Walter Boyer.14-36039
11/12/2014Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.14-37288
11/12/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge of Docketing Statement.14-37318
11/13/2014Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Item No. 26 - Documents 1 - 1714-37382
11/13/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Certificate of Service of Docketing Statement.14-37395
11/18/2014Transcript RequestFiled Certificate That No Transcripts Are Being Requested.14-38044
12/15/2014Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for January 21, 2015.14-40834
01/26/2015Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter.15-02794
01/28/2015Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellants: 45 days opening brief and appendix.15-03049
02/25/2015MotionFiled Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Appellants' Opening Brief.15-06007
02/25/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Opening Brief due date: April 13, 2015.15-06010
03/23/2015MotionFiled Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Appellants' Opening Brief.15-08667
04/03/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Opening Brief and Appendix due: May 13, 2015.15-10141
04/17/2015MotionFiled Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Appellants' Opening Brief (Third Request).15-11656
05/08/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Disapproving Stipulation. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix remain due on or before May 13, 2015.15-14111
05/11/2015MotionFiled Appellants' Emergency Motion Under NRAP 27(e) for Extension of Time to File Appellants' Opening Brief (Third Request).15-14300
05/11/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Certificate of Service (Appellants' Emergency Motion Under NRAP 27(e) for Extension of Time to File Appellants' Opening Brief).15-14329
05/14/2015BriefFiled Appellants' Opening Brief.15-14768
05/14/2015AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix - Master List.15-14822
05/14/2015AppendixFiled Appellants Appendix Volume 1.15-14823
05/14/2015AppendixFiled Appellants Appendix Volume 2.15-14824
05/14/2015AppendixFiled Appellants Appendix Volume 3.15-14825
05/14/2015AppendixFiled Appellants Appendix Volume 4.15-14826
05/14/2015AppendixFiled Appellants Appendix Volume 5.15-14827
05/14/2015AppendixFiled Appellants Appendix Volume 6.15-14828
05/14/2015AppendixFiled Appellants Appendix Volume 7.15-14857
05/14/2015AppendixFiled Appellants Appendix Volume 8.15-14859
05/14/2015AppendixFiled Appellants Appendix Volume 9.15-14831
05/14/2015AppendixFiled Appellants Appendix Volume 10.15-14860
05/14/2015AppendixFiled Appellants Appendix Volume 11.15-14861
05/14/2015AppendixFiled Appellants Appendix Volume 12.15-14862
05/14/2015AppendixFiled Appellants Appendix Volume 13.15-14863
05/14/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Certificate of Service.15-14864
05/14/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 7.15-14892
05/15/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellants' motion for a fourth extension of time to file the opening brief is granted. The opening brief and appendix were filed on May 14, 2015. Respondent: Answering brief due: 30 days.15-14936
06/12/2015MotionFiled Respondent's Emergency Motion Under NRAP 27(e) to Extend the TIme to File Respondent's Answering Brief (First Request).15-17901
06/12/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Answering Brief due: July 13, 2015.15-17903
07/10/2015MotionFiled Stipulation and Order to Extend Time to FIle Respondent's Answering Brief.15-21002
07/17/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Answering Brief due: August 12, 2015.15-21671
08/13/2015BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.15-24449
08/13/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Certificate of Service - Respondent's Answering Brief.15-24452
09/02/2015MotionFiled Stipulation For Extension of Time to File Appellants' Reply Brief (First Request).15-26630
09/02/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Reply Brief due date: October 12, 2015.15-26677
10/12/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Certificate of Service of Reply Brief.15-30972
10/12/2015BriefFiled Appellants' Reply Brief.15-30973
10/12/2015Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
10/12/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Certificate of Service. (Appellants' Reply Brief)15-31011
12/23/2015Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This court has determined that oral argument may be of assistance in resolving this matter. Accordingly, this matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar.15-39514
01/06/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Tuesday, January 26, 2016, at 10:00 a.m. for 30 minutes in Las Vegas.16-00309
01/07/2016MotionFiled Motion for Continuance of Oral Argument.16-00564
01/12/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.16-00862
01/21/2016Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Motion. Cause appearing, the motion to continue oral argument of this matter is granted. The oral argument scheduled for January 26, 2016, at 10:00 a.m. is hereby vacated. This matter will be rescheduled on the next available calendar.16-02087
02/03/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Monday, April 4, 2016, at 10:30 am for 30 minutes in Las Vegas.16-03666
03/21/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.16-08820
04/04/2016Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court.
07/28/2016Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Reversed." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Hardesty, J. Majority: Hardesty/Parraguirre/Douglas/Cherry/Saitta/Gibbons/Pickering. 132 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 55. EN BANC16-23425
08/22/2016RemittiturIssued Remittitur.16-25939
08/22/2016Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
09/15/2016RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on August 29, 2016.16-25939