Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 66772
Short Caption:KLABACKA VS. NELSON C/W 68292Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:66772*, 68292Related Case(s):63432, 63545, 68292, 77254
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D411537Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:11/04/2014 / Worrell, CarolynSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:02/06/2017 at 2:00 PMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:02/06/2017How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/27/2014Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Solomon Dwiggins & Freer. Check no. 14644.
10/27/2014Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SEALED).
10/27/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed.14-35716
10/27/2014Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Cross-Appeal. Filing fee will be forwarded by the District Court.
10/27/2014Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Cross-Appeal. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for cross-appellant.) (Respondent/Cross-Appellant). (SEALED).
10/27/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Civil. Due date: 10 days. (Respondent/Cross-Appellant).14-35729
11/03/2014Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. (Respondent/Cross-Appellant)14-36286
11/03/2014Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Rhonda K. Forsberg check no. 004135. (Respondent/Cross-Appellant)
11/04/2014Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Carolyn Worrell.14-36416
11/06/2014Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Docketing Statement due: November 24, 2014.14-36688
11/12/2014Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Robert P. Dickerson Chtd. Check no. 2495. (Respondent/Cross-Appellant - Lynita Sue Nelson).
11/12/2014Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Cross-Appeal. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for cross-appellant.) (Lynita Sue Nelson). (SEALED).
11/19/2014MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time Period For Filing Of Docketing Statement (Respondent/Cross-Appellant).14-38211
11/20/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Modification of Caption. Parties are advised to notify this office in writing within 10 days if the caption as modified does not accurately reflect the status of the parties.14-38300
11/25/2014Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals (Appellant/Cross-Respondent).14-38727
11/25/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Response to Notice of Modification of Caption.14-38742
11/25/2014Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (Respondent/Cross-Appellant)14-38745
11/25/2014Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals (Exhibits)14-38746
11/25/2014Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals (Exhibits)14-38747
12/03/2014Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals (Cross-Respondent Lynita Sue Nelson).14-39321
12/11/2014Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Denying Motion as Moot. Respondent/Cross-Appellant has filed a "Motion to Extend Time Period for Filing of Docketing Statement." As the docketing statement was filed on November 25, 2014, the motion is denied as moot.14-40421
01/30/2015Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for March 23, 2015, at 9:00 a.m.15-03388
02/10/2015Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. This is a correction for the date of the settlement conference. The correct date is: Friday, February 27, 2015 at 9:00 a.m.15-04408
03/13/2015Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: April 22, 2015 at 9:00 a.m.15-07800
05/11/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Modification of Caption. Parties are advised to notify this office in writing within 10 days if the caption as modified does not accurately reflect the status of the parties.15-14335
05/18/2015Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter.15-15079
05/19/2015Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated For Appeal and Cross-Appeal. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant and Respondents: 15 days transcript request; Appellant: 90 days opening brief and appendix.15-15335
05/27/2015MotionFiled Notice of Response to Notice of Modification of Caption and Motion to Modify Briefing Schedule.15-16111
05/28/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order. We deny the request to modify the caption. We clarify the direction in our order scheduling briefing as follows: "Each respondent/cross-appellant shall file a combined answering brief on appeal and opening brief on cross-appeal."15-16310
06/03/2015Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 1/31/12, 2/23/12. To Court Reporter: Transcript Video Services. (Appellant/Cross-Respondent).15-16998
06/03/2015Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 08/20/12, 08/22/12. To Court Reporter: Sherry Justice (Respondent/Cross-Appellant).15-17012
06/03/2015Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 11/16/10, 11/17/10, 11/22/10, 02/25/14. To Court Reporter: Family Court Transcript Services (Respondent/Cross-Appellant).15-17017
06/30/2015TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Kim Gurule stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 11/16/10, 11/17/10, 02/25/14.15-19951
06/30/2015TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Lawanda Brown stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 01/31/12, 02/23/12.15-19953
07/08/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Consolidating Appeals and Granting Stay Conditioned Upon Posting of Bond. Docket No. 68292: Docketing Statement due: 15 days. Appellant shall have 90 days from the date of this order to file and serve a single opening brief and appendix. Nos. 66772/68292.15-20764
07/23/2015MotionFiled Respondent/Cross-Appellant, Lynita Sue Nelson's, Motion for Clarification of the Order Consolidating Appeals and Granting Stay Conditioned Upon Posting of Bond, etc. Nos. 66772/68292.15-22293
07/23/2015Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals (68292). Nos. 66772/68292.15-22382
07/28/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Filing Supersedeas Bond Pursuant to Order Consolidating Appeals and Granting Stay Conditioned Upon Posting of Bond. Nos. 66772/68292.15-22826
07/28/2015Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant/Cross-Respondent Matt Klabacka's Opposition to "Motion for Clarification..." due: August 10, 2015. Nos. 66772/68292.15-22841
08/04/2015Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Respondent/cross-appellant Eric Nelson's Motion for Clarification of the Order Consolidating Appeals and Granting Stay Conditioned Upon Posting of Bond, to Dissolve Stay Proceedings and Orders Not Subject to Appeal, to Allow for Protection Against Harassment and Domestic Violence, and to Fully Define Amount of Bond due: August 10, 2015. Nos. 66772/68292.15-23452
08/04/2015TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter Lawanda Brown stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 08/20/12, 08/22/12. Nos. 66772/68292.15-23490
08/06/2015TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Kim Gurule stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 01/26/15. Nos. 66772/68292.15-23797
08/10/2015MotionFiled Opposition to Respondent/Cross-Appellant Eric Nelson's Motion For Clarification of the Order Consolidating Appeals and Granting Stay Condition Upon Posting of Bond, To Dissolve Stay of Proceedings and Orders Not Subject to Appeal, to Allow for Protection Against Harassment and Domestic Violence, and to Fully Define the Amount of Bond. Nos. 66772/68292.15-24076
08/11/2015MotionFiled Respondent/Cross-Appellant Eric Nelson's Opposition To Respondent/Cross-Appellant, Lynita Sue Nelson's Motion For Clarification Of The Order Consolidating Appeals And Granting Stay Conditions Upon Posting Of Bond, To Dissolve Stay Of Proceed. Nos. 66772/68292.15-24133
08/18/2015Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Lynita Sue Nelson's Reply to the Oppositions to the Motion for Clarification due: August 25, 2015. Nos. 66772/68292.15-24888
08/24/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Respondent Lynita Sue Nelson has filed a motion for clarification of our July 8, 2015, order consolidating these appeals and granting a stay of the proceedings below conditioned on appellant's posting of a supersedeas bond on July 28, 2015. Respondent Lynita Sue Nelson requests that this court limit or dissolve the stay with respect to "proceedings and enforcement of orders that have not been challenged on appeal," to "allow the district court to make necessary orders to protect Lynita," and to clarify the amount of the bond. The motion is opposed. Having considered the motion, we deny it. The motion is essentially a request that this court reconsider its order granting stay. No good cause appearing, we deny the request. Nos. 66772/68292.15-25556
08/26/2015MotionFiled Respondent/Cross-Appellant, Lynita Sue Nelson's, Reply to Oppositions to Motion for Clarification of the Order Consolidating Appeals and Granting Stay Conditioned Upon Posting of Bond, et. al.15-25845
09/03/2015MotionFiled Stipulation For Extension of Time to File Appellant/Cross Respondents' Opening Brief and Respondents/Cross Appellants' Response. Nos. 66772/6829215-26733
09/10/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Respondents/cross-appellants have now filed a reply to the opposition to the motion for clarification. Having considered the reply, we confirm our denial of the motion. The substantive terms of the divorce decree are before this court on appeal. All proceedings in the district court in case no. D-09-411537-D shall be stayed pending further order of this court. Nos. 66772/68292.15-27350
09/21/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellants/cross-respondent's Opening Brief and Appendix due: November 30, 2015. Respondents/cross-appellants and respondents Answering Briefs due: February 1, 2016. Nos. 66772/68292.15-28423
12/01/2015BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.15-36381
12/01/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 1.15-36382
12/01/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 215-36383
12/01/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 315-36384
12/01/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 415-36402
12/01/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 515-36403
12/01/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 615-36404
12/01/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 6.15-36405
12/01/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 715-36408
12/01/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 815-36409
12/01/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 915-36410
12/01/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 1015-36412
12/01/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 1115-36413
12/01/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 1215-36414
12/01/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 1315-36416
12/01/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 1415-36418
12/01/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 1515-36419
12/01/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 1615-36420
12/01/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 1715-36422
12/01/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 1815-36423
12/01/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 1915-36424
12/01/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 2015-36425
12/01/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 2115-36426
12/01/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 2215-36427
12/01/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 2315-36428
12/01/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 2415-36429
12/01/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 2515-36431
12/01/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 2615-36432
12/01/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 2715-36433
12/01/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 2815-36434
12/01/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 2915-36435
12/01/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 3015-36437
01/29/2016MotionFiled Respondent / Cross-Appellant, Lynita Sue Nelson's, Motion for Extension of Time to File Combined Answering Brief on Appeal and Opening Brief on Cross-Appeal. Nos. 66772/68292.16-03103
01/29/2016MotionFiled Respondent / Cross-Appellant, Lynita Sue Nelson's, Motion for Approval of Parties' Stipulation for Extension of Time to file Respondent's / Cross-Appellants' Combined Answering Briefs, et. al. Nos. 66772/68292.16-03185
02/08/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Respondents/cross-appellants' combined answering briefs on appeal and opening briefs on cross-appeal due: March 1, 2016. Appellant/cross-respondent's combined reply brief on appeal and answering brief on cross-appeal due: April 15, 2016. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 28.1(f)(1)(D). fn1[We deny as moot respondent/cross-appellant Lynita Sue Nelson's motion for an extension of time to file the answering brief on appeal and opening brief on cross-appeal.] Nos. 66772/68292.16-04152
03/01/2016BriefFiled Respondent/Cross-Appellant Eric L. Nelson's Answering Brief and Opening Brief on Cross-Appeal. Nos. 66772/68292.16-06603
03/02/2016AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief Volume 1. Nos. 66772/68292.16-06676
03/02/2016AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief Volume 2. Nos. 66772/68292.16-06677
03/02/2016AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief Volume 3. Nos. 66772/68292.16-06679
03/02/2016BriefFiled Respondent / Cross-Appellant, Lynita Sue Nelson's, Answering Brief and Opening Brief on Cross-Appeal. Nos. 66772/68292.16-06680
03/02/2016AppendixFiled Respondent / Cross-Appellant, Lynita Sue Nelson's Appendix Volume 1. Nos. 66772/68292.16-06681
03/02/2016AppendixFiled Respondent / Cross-Appellant, Lynita Sue Nelson's Appendix Volume 2. Nos. 66772/68292.16-06683
03/02/2016AppendixFiled Respondent / Cross-Appellant, Lynita Sue Nelson's Appendix Volume 3. Nos. 66772/68292.16-06684
03/02/2016AppendixFiled Respondent / Cross-Appellant, Lynita Sue Nelson's Appendix Volume 4. Nos. 66772/68292.16-06685
03/02/2016AppendixFiled Respondent / Cross-Appellant, Lynita Sue Nelson's Appendix Volume 5. Nos. 66772/68292.16-06686
03/02/2016AppendixFiled Respondent / Cross-Appellant, Lynita Sue Nelson's Appendix Volume 6. Nos. 66772/68292.16-06688
04/05/2016MotionFiled Stipulation and Joint Request/Motion Regarding Remaining Briefing Schedule. Nos. 66772/68292.16-10505
04/19/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Approving Stipulation. The Eric L. Nelson Nevada Trust Dated May 30, 2001, shall have until May 3, 2016, to file and serve its combined reply brief on appeal and answering brief on cross-appeal to Lynita Sue Nelson's opening brief on cross-appeal and, if it so chooses, to Eric L. Nelson's opening brief on cross-appeal. Lynita Sue Nelson and Eric L. Nelson shall have until June 3, 2016, to file and serve their reply briefs on cross-appeal. Nos. 66772/68292.16-12124
05/04/2016AppendixFiled Appendix (Record on Appeal), Volume 31. Nos. 66772/68292.16-13952
05/04/2016BriefFiled Respondent / Cross-Appellant, Lynita Sue Nelson's, Answering Brief to Respondent/ Cross-Appellant, Eric L. Nelson's, Opening Brief on Cross-Appeal. Nos. 66772/68292.16-14034
05/05/2016BriefFiled Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Reply and Answering Brief. Nos. 66772/68292.16-14083
06/03/2016MotionFiled Stipulation and Request/ Motion for One Week Extension for Final Reply Briefs.16-17278
06/03/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Reply Briefs on cross appeal due date: June 10, 2016. Nos. 66772/68292.16-17372
06/13/2016BriefFiled Respondent/Cross-Appellant Eric Nelson's Reply Brief. Nos. 66772/68292.16-18315
06/13/2016BriefFiled Respondent / Cross-Appellant, Lynita Sue Nelson's, Reply Brief on Cross-Appeal. Nos. 66772/68292.16-18317
06/13/2016Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. Nos. 66772/68292.
11/14/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This court has determined that oral argument may be of assistance in resolving this matter. Accordingly, this matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar. Nos. 66772/68292.16-35283
11/28/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Wednesday, January 4, 2017, at 11:30 a.m. for 30 minutes in Carson City.16-36750
11/30/2016MotionFiled Stipulation and Joint Request/Motion to Continue January 4, 2017 Oral Argument to February, 2017 if Possible. Nos. 66772/68292.16-37109
12/01/2016Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. The oral argument scheduled for January 4, 2017, at 11:30 a.m. is hereby vacated. This matter will be rescheduled on the next available calendar. Nos. 66772/68292.16-37188
12/21/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Monday, February 6, 2017, at 11:30 a.m. for 30 minutes in Carson City.16-39738
01/24/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.17-02544
01/26/2017Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Changing Time of Oral Argument. This matter is currently scheduled for oral argument at 11:30 a.m. on February 6, 2017. Due to the court's calendar, the start time for the argument is hereby changed. Oral argument will now be held at 2:00 p.m. on February 6, 2017, in Carson City. Nos. 66772/68292.17-02988
02/06/2017Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court.
05/25/2017Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed in part, vacated in part, and remanded." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Gibbons, J. Majority: Gibbons/Cherry/Douglas/Pickering/Hardesty/Parraguirre/Stiglich. 133 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 24. EN BANC Nos. 66772/6829217-17511
06/20/2017RemittiturIssued Remittitur.17-20310
06/20/2017Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/14/2017RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on June 29, 2017.17-20310