Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 66773
Short Caption:WHEATON (SHAUNTAY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):37531, 37553, 40150, 42638, 44093, 46213, 46887, 51332, 53085, 62069, 62372, 66079, 66080, 66428, 66428-COA, 66773-COA, 69542, 70017, 70017-COA, 76899, 82127, 82127-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C156542Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:01/06/2015How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/27/2014Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
10/27/2014Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.14-35681
11/21/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record. Record on Appeal due: 60 days.14-38396
01/06/2015Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal. Pages 854-864 (SEALED).
01/06/2015Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal. Pages 1587-1595 (SEALED).
01/06/2015Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal. Volume 1-17 via FTP.15-00324
01/06/2015Case Status UpdateSubmitted for Decision.
01/23/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Transferring Case to Court of Appeals. The clerk of this court is directed to assign this appeal to the Court of Appeals of Nevada for Disposition.15-02646
02/24/2015Order/DispositionalFiled "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Fn2[We have reviewed all documents that appellant has submitted to the clerk of this court in this matter, and we conclude that no relief based upon those submissions is warranted.] Court of Appeals-MG/JT/AS
03/23/2015Case Status UpdateTransferred from Court of Appeals.
03/23/2015RemittiturIssued Remittitur.15-08782
03/23/2015Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/08/2015RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on March 30, 2015.15-08782