Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 66785
Short Caption:O'KEEFE (BRIAN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):44372, 44644, 48673, 49329, 65040, 81867, 81867-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C202793Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/28/2014Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
10/28/2014Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.14-35883
11/03/2014Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Minutes. (SEALED)
12/05/2014Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." NNP14-KP/RP/NS14-39624
12/30/2014RemittiturIssued Remittitur.14-42397
12/30/2014Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/16/2015RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on January 6, 2015.14-42397