Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Combined Case Information: 66816 & 66816-COA
Short Caption:QUISANO (JONATHAN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court & Court of Appeals
Related Case(s):66816-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C294266Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/04/2014Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
11/04/2014Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Filed certified copy of notice of appeal. (Fast Track Notice issued to counsel for appellant.)14-36489
12/05/2014TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter Kiara Schmidt stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 12/03/13.14-39583
12/16/2014MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time Due to Late Receipt of Transcripts (Fast Track Statement).14-40860
12/17/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: February 13, 2015.14-40995
02/17/2015Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement.15-04981
02/17/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement Vol I.15-04982
02/17/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement Vol II.15-04983
02/17/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement Vol III.15-04984
02/17/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement Vol IV.15-04985
02/17/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement Vol V.15-04986
02/17/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement Vol VI.15-04987
02/17/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement Vol VII. (STRICKEN PER 03/06/15 ORDER).
02/18/2015MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Leave to Supplement Appellant's Appendix.15-05199
03/06/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The clerk of this court shall strike volume VII of the appendix filed on February 17, 2015, and file the version of volume VII received on February 18, 2015.15-07007
03/06/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement Vol VII.15-07008
03/09/2015Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response.15-07277
03/24/2015Fast Track BriefFiled Reply to Fast Track Response.15-08863
03/24/2015Case Status UpdateFast Track Briefing Completed.
04/27/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Transferring Case to Court of Appeals. The clerk of this court is directed to assign this appeal to the Court of Appeals of Nevada for disposition.15-12741
04/27/2015Case Status UpdateTransferred from Supreme Court.
05/05/2015Case Status UpdateSubmitted for Decision.
05/26/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order. for Supplemental Briefing. Appellant: Supplemental Fast Track Statement: due 20 days not to exceed 10 pages or 4,667 words, and if necessary, a supplemental appendix. Respondent: Fast Track Response: due 20 days after service of Fast Track Statement not to exceed 10 pages or 4,667 words. Appellant: Supplemental Fast Track Reply: due 10 days from filing of the Supplemental Fast Track Response not to exceed 5 pages or 2,334 words.15-900564
06/18/2015MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Appellant's Moiton for One Day Extension of Time to File Supplemental Fast Track Statement.15-900665
06/18/2015Fast Track BriefReceived Fast Track Statement. Supplemental Fast Track Statement. (FILED PER ORDER 06/26/15.)
06/26/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. . The clerk shall file the Supplemental Fast Track Statement received on June 18, 2015. Supplemental Fast Track Response due on or before July 6, 2015.15-900698
06/26/2015Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. Supplemental Fast Track Statement.15-900699
07/16/2015MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. -Motion for Englargement of Time to file Responent's Supplemental Fast Track Response.15-900781
07/16/2015Fast Track BriefReceived Fast Track Response. -Supplmental. (FILED PER ORDER DATED JULY 16, 2015.)
07/16/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. for an extension of time to file the Supplemental Fast Track Response. Appellant: Supplemental Fast Track Reply: 10 days.15-900789
07/16/2015BriefFiled Supplemental Brief. -Supplemental Fast Track Response.15-900790
07/28/2015Fast Track BriefFiled Reply to Fast Track Response. Reply to Supplemental Fast Track Response.15-900824
02/18/2016Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before Gibbons/Tao/Silver. Author: Silver, J. Majority: Silver/Gibbons. Tao, J., concurring in part and dissenting in part. 132 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 9. Court of Appeals/Gibbons/Tao/Silver.
02/18/2016Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before Gibbons/Tao/Silver. Author: Silver, J. Majority: Silver/Gibbons. Tao, J., concurring in part and dissenting in part. 132 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 9. Court of Appeals/Gibbons/Tao/Silver.16-900212
03/07/2016Case Status UpdateTransferred from Court of Appeals.
03/07/2016Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for Review by the Supreme Court. (Respondent)16-07259
03/07/2016Case Status UpdateTransferred to Supreme Court.
03/07/2016Case Status UpdateCase Closed.
03/18/2016MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Strike the State's Petition for Review by the Nevada Supreme Court.16-08695
03/21/2016MotionFiled Opposition to Motion to Strike State's Petition for Review.16-08922
04/13/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Appellant has filed a motion to strike respondent's petition for review, alleging that respondent is not aggrieved by the opinion of the Court of Appeals. The motion to strike is denied.16-11569
04/22/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer To Petition for Review. Answer due: 15 days. We stay the issuance of the remittitur in this matter pending resolution of the petition for review.16-12686
04/27/2016Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Answer to State's Petition for Review.16-13227
05/12/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter (dated 5/3/16) to Publishers with corrections to recently filed opinions. Nos. 65424/66816/67465/53626/62493/69580/65681/66473 (Letter entered in Docket No. 65424 as document no. 16-14923.)
05/12/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. (dated 5/3/16) to Publishers with corrections to recently filed opinions. Nos. 65424/66816/67465/53626/62493/69580/65681/6647316-900562
06/24/2016Post-Judgment Order/DispositionalOrder Denying Petition for Review. On February 18, 2016, the court of appeals issued an opinion in this matter. Pending before this court is respondent's petition for review of that opinion. The petition is denied to the extent it seeks to alter the court of appeals' determination of the matter. However, the opinion is hereby withdrawn from publication; the clerk is directed not to publish the February 18, 2016, opinion in the Nevada Reports.16-19850
07/20/2016RemittiturIssued Remittitur.16-22526
07/20/2016Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/08/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter dated June 30, 2016 to Publishers with corrections to recently filed opinions. Nos. 66816/(59691/68304)/66888/65193/65388/(67756/67763)/68476/63178/62720/6428116-24439
08/08/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. Letter dated June 30, 2016 to Publishers with corrections to recently filed opinions. Nos. 66816/(59691/68304)16-900917
08/09/2016RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on July 28, 2016.16-22526