The Supreme Court
of Nevada
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 66854
Short Caption:VALDEZ VS. AGUILARClassification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Other
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - FV1004478Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Disqualifications:Panel Assigned: En Banc
Replacement:
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:02/10/2016How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/13/2014Filing FeeFiling fee due for Appeal.
11/13/2014Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.14-37363
11/13/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days.14-37375
11/13/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Case Appeal Statement. Corrected case appeal statement due: 10 days.14-37377
11/14/2014Order/IncomingFiled District court order. Certified copy of order waiving costs filed in district court on 11/10/14.14-37574
11/18/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Exemption from Settlement Program/File Documents. Transcript request due: 15 days. Opening brief due: 120 days. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 20 days.14-37947
11/21/2014Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement (Corrected).14-38480
12/05/2014Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.14-39676
03/12/2015BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.15-07676
03/12/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief.15-07677
04/10/2015BriefFiled Washoe County District Attorney's Answering Brief.15-10830
05/08/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Errata to Appellant's Opening Brief.15-14152
05/12/2015BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.15-14480
05/12/2015Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
02/10/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument.16-04358
05/26/2016Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Reversed and Remanded." Before the Court EN BANC. Author: Hardesty, J. Majority: Parraguirre/Hardesty/Douglas/Cherry/Saitta/Gibbons/Pickering 132 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 3716-16621
06/21/2016RemittiturIssued Remittitur.16-19365
06/21/2016Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/01/2016RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on June 23, 2016.16-19365