Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 66876
Short Caption:BREEDEN VS. DIST. CT. (GONZALEZ)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):65596, 66257
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A647859Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus/Prohibition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/17/2014Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $250.00 from Adam J. Breeden.
11/17/2014Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Prohibition or, in the Alternative, Writ of Mandamus.14-37800
11/24/2014AppendixFiled Appendix of Exhibits for Petition for Writ of Prohibition or, in the Alternative, Writ of Mandamus.14-38603
12/15/2014MotionFiled Emergency Motion to Stay the District Court's Orders Pending Further Rulings from the Nevada Supreme Court14-40647
12/15/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Errata to Petitioners' Emergency Motion to Stay District Court's Orders Pending Further Rulings from the Nevada Supreme Court.14-40714
12/16/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion for Stay.14-40887
12/16/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Answer Writ Petition. Real Party in Interest's Answer due: 30 days.14-40890
12/17/2014AppendixFiled Petitioner's Supplemental Appendix.14-41101
01/07/2015MotionFiled Petitioners' Motion for Leave to a File Supplemental Brief in Support of Petition for Writ of of Prohibition or Mandamus.15-00622
01/15/2015Petition/WritFiled Real Party In Interest's Answering Brief in Response to Petition for Writ of Prohibition or, in the Alternative, Writ of Mandamus.15-01589
01/15/2015AppendixFiled Appendix for the Answer to Petition of Writ - Volume 1.15-01594
01/15/2015AppendixFiled Appendix for the Answer to Petition of Writ - Volume 2.15-01595
01/15/2015AppendixFiled Appendix for the Answer to Petition of Writ - Volume 3.15-01597
01/20/2015MotionFiled Emergency Motion to Dismiss Writ Petition Without Prejudice.15-01870
01/20/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion to Supplement Writ Petition. The clerk of this court shal file the supplement to the writ petition and the appendix to that supplement, that were both received on January 7, 2015.15-01890
01/20/2015Petition/WritFiled Supplement to Petition for Writ - Supplemental Brief in Support of Petition for Writ of Prohibition or Mandamus.15-01893
01/20/2015AppendixFiled Supplemental Appendix of Exhibits for Petition for Writ of Prohibition or, in the Alternative, Writ of Mandamus.15-01894
01/27/2015MotionFiled Respondent's Opposition to Emergency Motion to Dismiss Writ Petition or, in the Alternative, Motion for Damages and Costs Pursuant to NRAP 38.15-02856
01/27/2015ExhibitFiled Exhibits: Appendix to Respondent's Opposition to Emergency Motion to Dismiss Writ Petition Without Petition or, in the Alternative, Motion for Damages and Costs Pursuant to NRAP 38.15-02857
01/27/2015MotionFiled Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief in Support of Emergency Motion to Dismiss Writ Petition Without Prejudice.15-02862
01/29/2015MotionFiled Petitioners' Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief in Support of Petition for Writ of Prohibition or, in the Alternative, Writ of Mandamus.15-03234
02/17/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Proofs of Service Regarding Emergency Motion to Dismiss Writ Without Prejudice.15-04970
03/05/2015Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Motion granted; petition dismissed." We therefore deny Gonzalez's countermotion for costs without prejudice to her right to seek allowable costs via a bill of costs. The motions for leave to file a reply in support of the motion to dismiss and a reply in support of the petition are denied. The clerk of this court shall reject the reply to the petition received via E-Flex on January 29, 2015. Before: Saitta/Gibbons/Pickering. Author: Pickering, J. Majority: Pickering/Saitta/Gibbons. 131 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 12. NNP14-SN/MG/KP15-06891
03/05/2015Case Status UpdateCase Closed.
03/11/2015MotionFiled Bill of Costs.15-07495
03/16/2015MotionFiled Petitioners' Motion to Deny or in the Alternative to Re-Tax Costs/Opposition to Bill of Costs.15-07941
10/14/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Disapproving Costs. Real party in interest Elvia Gonzalez has filed a bill of costs in this matter. NRAP 39 allows the taxing of certain costs in civil appeals. The rule does not apply to original writ petitions. Accordingly, real party in interest is not entitled to any costs under NRAP 39 and the bill of costs is disapproved.16-32210