The Supreme Court
of Nevada
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 66888
Short Caption:POREMBA VS. SO. NEVADA PAVINGClassification:Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A698184Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Disqualifications:Panel Assigned: En Banc
Replacement:
To SP/Judge:11/24/2014 / Mishel, PersiSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:01/28/2016 at 11:30 AMOral Argument Location:Regional Justice Center
Submission Date:09/23/2016How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/18/2014Filing FeeFiling fee due for Appeal. Filing fee will be forwarded by the District Court.
11/18/2014Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)14-37990
11/18/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed.14-37999
11/18/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Case Appeal Statement. Corrected case appeal statement due: 10 days.14-38002
11/19/2014Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Dunkley Law LLC. Check no. 1844.
11/24/2014Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Persi J. Mishel.14-38538
11/26/2014Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Corrected Case Appeal Statement.14-39006
12/08/2014Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.14-39881
12/08/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge (Docketing Statement).14-39908
12/09/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Certificate of Service on Settlement Judge of Docketing Statement.14-39999
12/24/2014Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation.14-42124
12/26/2014Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellant: 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief.14-42196
01/09/2015Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request.15-00995
03/27/2015AppendixFiled Opening Brief Appendix - Volume I.15-09288
03/27/2015AppendixFiled Opening Brief Appendix - Volume II - Part 1.15-09289
03/27/2015AppendixFiled Opening Brief Appendix - Volume II - Part 2.15-09291
03/27/2015AppendixFiled Opening Brief Appendix - Volume III.15-09292
03/27/2015AppendixFiled Opening Brief Appendix - Volume IV.15-09293
03/27/2015AppendixFiled Opening Brief Appendix - Volume V.15-09294
03/27/2015AppendixFiled Opening Brief Appendix - Volume VI.15-09296
03/27/2015AppendixFiled Opening Brief Appendix - Volume VII.15-09297
03/27/2015AppendixFiled Opening Brief Appendix - Volume VIII.15-09298
03/27/2015AppendixFiled Opening Brief Appendix - Volume IX.15-09299
03/27/2015AppendixFiled Alphabetical Index To Appendix.15-09347
03/27/2015BriefFiled Opening Brief Appellant's Opening Brief15-09383
06/09/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Answering Brief due: 11 days.15-17585
07/08/2015MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time To File Respondents' Answering Brief.15-20788
07/17/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Answering Brief due: July 24, 2015.15-21749
07/27/2015BriefFiled Respondents' Southern Nevada Paving's and S & C Claims Services, Inc.'s Answering Brief.15-22656
08/27/2015BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.15-25983
08/27/2015Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
12/01/2015Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar.15-36390
12/03/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Thursday, January 28, 2016, at 11:30 a.m. for 30 minutes in Las Vegas.15-36898
12/30/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.15-40095
01/28/2016Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the Northern Nevada Panel. NNP16-MD/MC/MG.
04/07/2016Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Reversed and remanded with instructions." Before: Douglas/Cherry/Gibbons. Author: Cherry, J. Majority: Cherry/Douglas/gibbons. 132 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 24. NNP16D-MD/MC/MG16-10872
04/13/2016Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Respondents' Southern Nevada Paving's and S&C Claims Services, Inc.'s Petition for Rehearing.16-11599
04/13/2016Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from Daniel L. Schwartz
05/26/2016Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c).16-16610
05/31/2016Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Respondents' Southern Nevada Paving's and S&C Claim Serivces, Inc.'s Petition for En Banc Reconsideration.16-16919
07/22/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer to Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. Appellant's Answer due: 15 days.16-22803
07/28/2016Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Answer to Petition for En Banc Reconsideration due: August 15, 2016.16-23478
08/08/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter dated June 30, 2016 to Publishers with corrections to recently filed opinions. Nos. 66816/(59691/68304)/66888/65193/65388/(67756/67763)/68476/63178/62720/64281 (Letter entered in 66816 as document no. 16-24439.)
08/16/2016Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Answer to Petition for En Banc Reconsideration.16-25419
09/23/2016Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Granting En Banc Reconsideration. This matter shall stand submitted on the briefs and record previously filed.16-29594
09/23/2016Case Status UpdateSubmitted for Decision.
01/26/2017Opinion/Non-DispositionalFiled Opinion on Reconsideration. "Petition granted; reversed and remanded with instructions." Fn6[The Honorable Lidia S. Stiglich, Justice, did not participate in the decision of this matter.] Before the Court En Banc. Author: Cherry, C.J. Majority: Cherry/Douglas/Gibbons/Pickering/Hardesty/Parraguirre. 133 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 2.17-02862
02/28/2017RemittiturIssued Remittitur.17-06753
02/28/2017Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/23/2017RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on March 15, 2017.17-06753