Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Combined Administrative Case: ADKT 0502
Short Caption:IN RE: ADOPTION OF NRCP 16.215Court:Supreme Court
Classification:Administrative - ADKT - ADKTCase Status:Case Closed
Filed Date:11/24/2014Public Hearing:01/08/2015 at 1:00 PM (Nevada Supreme Court Courtroom Carson City, NV)
Closed Date:05/22/2015

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/24/2014Administrative CaseFiled Petition (Exhibit 1 attached).14-38597
12/24/2014Administrative CaseFiled Order Scheduling Public Hearing and Requesting Public Comment. A copy of the petition and the proposed rule is attached. Hearing to be held Thursday, January 8, 2015, at 1 p.m. in the Supreme Court Courtroom in Carson City. Videoconferenced to RJC in Las Vegas. Original and 8 copies of written comments due to Clerk by 5 p.m. on January 2, 2015. Persons interested in participating must notify the Clerk no later than January 2, 2015.14-42113
01/08/2015Administrative CasePublic Hearing Held. Public Hearing held on the Administrative Docket.
01/14/2015Letter/IncomingFiled Letter from The Dickerson Law Group regarding concerns about proposed NRCP 16.215.15-01431
01/26/2015Administrative CaseFiled Letter received from attorney Gary R Silverman with the Law Firm Silverman, Decaria & Kattelman, Chtd regarding proposed changes to NRCP Rule 16 215.15-02732
05/22/2015Administrative CaseFiled Order Adopting Nevada Rule of Civil Procedure 16.215 (Exhibit A attached). effective 60 days from the date of this order.15-15733
05/22/2015Administrative CaseCase Closed.