The Supreme Court
of Nevada
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 67063
Short Caption:IN RE: PARENTAL RIGHTS AS TO M.F., M.F. & N.F.Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Parental Termination/Proper Person
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - FV1102393Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Disqualifications:Panel Assigned: En Banc
Replacement:
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:12/28/2015How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/16/2014Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal.
12/16/2014Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. Filed certified copy of proper person notice of appeal.14-40990
12/16/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days.14-40993
01/08/2015Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Certified copy of Order Regarding Waiver of Fees and Costs filed in district court on 12/23/14. (Submitted by Appellant)15-00850
01/13/2015Case Status UpdatePilot Program Civil Appeals. Order and documents mailed to proper person appellant. Civil proper person transcript request form due: 15 days. Civil proper person appeal statement due: 40 days.
02/10/2015MotionFiled Request for Clarification regarding Representation.15-04396
02/23/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order. We conclude that all parties are now represented by counsel, and we remove this appeal from the pilot program for processing proper person civil appeals. Transcript Request Form due: 15 days. Opening Brief and Appendix due: 90 days. fn1[We direct the clerk of this court to modify the docket sheet to add the Washoe County Alternate Public Defender as counsel for appellant.]15-05640
04/01/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Compliance with NRAP 9. Transcript Request Form due: 11 days.15-09833
05/22/2015BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.15-15818
05/22/2015AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 1.15-15819
05/22/2015AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 2.15-15820
05/22/2015AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 3.15-15822
05/22/2015AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 4.15-15823
05/26/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Conditionally Imposing Sanctions. Conditional sanction of $ 250 due: 15 days or Transcript Request Form due: 11 days.15-15999
05/28/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Motion for Transcripts at Public Expense. (Filed at district court).15-16289
05/29/2015Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 8/11/14-8/14/14 Court Reporter: Ramona McGinnis.15-16519
06/19/2015Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Answering Brief due; June 29, 2015.15-18803
06/29/2015BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.15-19794
07/14/2015TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Ramona McGinnis stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 08/11/14, 08/12/14, 08/13/14, 08/14/14.15-21317
07/27/2015Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Reply Brief due: August 5, 2015.15-22645
08/05/2015BriefFiled Reply to Respondent's Arguments (Reply Brief).15-23591
08/05/2015Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
12/28/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision without Oral Argument.15-39681
03/31/2016Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Gibbons, J. Majority: Gibbons/Parraguirre/Hardesty/Douglas/Cherry/Saitta/Pickering. 132 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 19. EN BANC16-10011
04/25/2016RemittiturIssued Remittitur.16-12861
04/25/2016Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
05/10/2016RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on April 27, 2016.16-12861
07/25/2016Notice/IncomingFiled Notice from US Supreme Court/Certiorari Filed. A petition for a writ of certiorari was filed June 28, 2016 and placed on the docket as Case No. 16-5305.16-23037
10/11/2016Notice/IncomingFiled Notice from US Supreme Court/Certiorari Denied. The petition for a writ of certiorari is denied.16-31598