Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 67120
Short Caption:ADELSON VS. HARRIS (NRAP 5)Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):NONEClassification:Original Proceeding - NRAP 5 - U.S. Court of Appeals
Disqualifications:Cherry, PickeringCase Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:None for Justice Cherry<br/>None for Chief Justice PickeringPanel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:04/04/2016 at 11:30 AMOral Argument Location:Regional Justice Center
Submission Date:04/04/2016How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/26/2014Filing FeeFiling Fee Due.
12/26/2014Order/IncomingFiled Certifying Question to Nevada Supreme Court. Received from U.S. Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit and the Honorable Guido Calabresi, Circuit Judge.14-42151
12/26/2014Other Incoming DocumentFiled Court of Appeals Docket.14-42152
01/20/2015Other Incoming DocumentFiled Errata Sheet for Opinion dated 12/19/14.15-01938
03/19/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Accepting Certified Questions, Directing Briefing, and Directing Submission of Filing Fee. Opening Brief due: 45 days. Answering Brief due: 30 days from service of opening brief. Reply Brief due: 20 days from service of answering brief. Appellant and Respondent shall each tender to the clerk of this court, within 11 days from the date of this order, the sum of $125, representing half of the filing fee. fn1[As the Second Circuit provided the excerpts of record filed in the appeal to that court, the parties shall cite to the excerpts of record rather than file an appendix.] fn2[The Honorable Kristina Pickering, Justice, did not participate in the decision of this matter.]15-08464
03/20/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Judge Disqualification. Hon. Kristina Pickering disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Voluntary Recusal.15-08648
03/27/2015Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $125.00 from Levine Sullivan Koch & Schulz, LLP. Check No. 37296. (Respondent)
03/31/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance (Steve Morris as counsel for the Appellant).15-09606
04/01/2015Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $125.00 from Morris Law Group. Check No. 35446 (Appellant).
05/05/2015BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.15-13659
05/08/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Color Copies of Page 3 of Appellant's Opening Brief.15-14188
06/03/2015BriefFiled Respondents' Answering Brief.15-16987
06/05/2015MotionFiled Respondents' Motion to Submit DVD Containing Petition at Issue with Working Hyperlinks.15-17126
06/16/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. J. Colby Williams, Esq., appearing as counsel for respondents.15-18257
06/16/2015MotionFiled Respondents' Motion to Associate Counsel (Lee Levine).15-18258
06/16/2015MotionFiled Respondents' Motion to Associate Counsel (Seth Berlin).15-18259
06/16/2015BriefFiled Brief for Amici Curiae Media Organizations in Support of Respondents.15-18398
06/17/2015Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Reply Brief due: June 30, 2015.15-18443
06/22/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motions. The court shall consider the DVD submitted with respondents' motion. Attorneys Seth Daniel Berlin and Lee Jay Levine of Levine Sullivan Koch & Schulz, LLP, shall be allowed to appear on behalf of respondents. Attorney J. Colby Williams of Campbell & Williams shall be responsible for al matters presented by Mr. Berlin and Mr. Levine in this matter.15-18936
06/25/2015MotionFiled Amici Curiae Media Organization's Motion to Associate Counsel (Laura R. Handman, Esq.).15-19392
06/25/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Kristen T. Gallagher and Laura R. Handman appearing as counsel for Amici Curiae Media Organizations in Support or Respondents.15-19393
07/01/2015BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.15-20036
07/01/2015Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
07/02/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Having considered the motion to associate, we grant it. Attorney Laura Handman shall be allowed to appear on behalf of amici curiae Media Organizations. Attorney Kristen T. Gallagher shall be responsible for all matters presented by Ms. Handman in this matter.15-20246
01/19/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Re: Scheduling Of Oral Argument. This court has determined that oral argument may be of assistance in resolving this matter. Accordingly, this matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar.16-01674
01/22/2016Letter/IncomingFiled Letter from J. Colby Williams, Esq. dated January 22, 2016 (Regarding Oral Argument).16-02275
02/03/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Monday, April 4, 2016, at 11:30 am for 30 minutes in Las Vegas.16-03667
02/26/2016Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Suggestion of Recusal.16-06166
03/21/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.16-08821
03/23/2016Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance for Oral Argument, Daniel F. Polsenberg of the law firm of Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP for the appellant Sheldon G. Adelson.16-09139
03/29/2016MotionFiled Motion to Associate Counsel. (Gayle Sproul per SCR 42)16-09748
03/29/2016Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Letter from Alan Hagman/Los Angeles Times requesting photograph/record (still photography and video) in the courtroom during Adelson v. Harris case on 4/4/16.16-09818
03/30/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Media Request. Permission is granted for photographic or electronic media coverage of the court proceedings. Alan Hagman of the Los Angeles Times is designated as pool coordinator for purposes of organizing and coordinating the orderly coverage of such proceedings by all participants.16-09859
03/30/2016MotionFiled Motion requesting permission to photograph in the courtroom during the argument in Adelson v. Harris, Case No. 67120 on April 4, 20106, or in the alternative, participate in the pool arrangement. (New York Times Co.) Filed via fax.16-09860
03/31/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Media Request. Mr. David McCraw of The New York Times Company shall coordinate with Alan Hagman of the Los Angeles Times, who was previously designated as pool coordinator for purposes of organizing and coordinating the orderly coverage of such proceedings by all participants.16-10088
03/31/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Voluntary Recusal. Associate Justice Michael A. Cherry hereby recuses himself from this appeal.16-10147
04/01/2016Notice/IncomingFiled Sheldon G. Adelson's Response to Respondents' Notice of Suggestion of Recusal.16-10227
04/04/2016Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court.
04/06/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion to Associate Counsel. Attorney Gayle Chatilo Sproul of Levin Sullivan Koch & Schulz, LLP shall be permitted to appear on behalf of respondents in this matter. Nevada attorney J. Colby Williams of Campbell & Williams shall be responsible for all matters presented by Sproul in this appeal.16-10781
06/23/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Respondent's Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance (Gayle C. Sproul).17-20947
06/26/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Address (Morris Law Group).17-21022
06/28/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Cause appearing, the motion to withdraw as counsel of record filed by Gayle C. Sproul is granted. The clerk shall remove Mr. Sproul as counsel of record for respondents. Respondents remain represented by Seth D. Berlin, Chad R. Bowman, Lee J. Levine, and Rachel F. Storm of Levine Sullivan Koch & Schulz, LLP; and Donald J. Campbell and J. Colby Williams of Campbell & Williams.17-21595
09/27/2017Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Questions answered." Fn1[Chief Justice Michael Cherry and Justice Kristina Pickering are disqualified from this case.] Before the Court En Banc. Author: Hardesty, J. Majority: Hardesty/Douglas/Gibbons/Parraguirre/Stiglich. 133 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 67. EN BANC17-32838
10/23/2017RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur.17-36235
10/23/2017Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.