Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 67136
Short Caption:BERGENFIELD VS. BAC HOME LOANS SERV., LPCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A704157Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Justice Hardesty for Justice PickeringPanel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:01/13/2015 / Aurbach, PhillipSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/30/2014Filing FeeFiling fee due for Appeal.
12/30/2014Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.14-42476
12/30/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days.14-42478
12/30/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Civil. Due date: 10 days.14-42480
12/30/2014Filing FeeE-Payment $250.00 from Jacob L. Hafter
12/31/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 20 days.14-42546
12/31/2014Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement.14-42563
01/13/2015Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Phillip Aurbach.15-01339
01/26/2015MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time to File Docketing Statement.15-02834
01/28/2015Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion for extension of time to file the docketing statement. The docketing statement received on January 26, 2015, shall be filed.15-03046
01/28/2015Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.15-03047
02/11/2015Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation.15-04463
02/12/2015Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellant: 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief.15-04664
02/25/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order to Show Cause. Appellants' Response due: 30 days. Respondent may file a reply within ten days from the date that appellants' response is served.15-06029
02/27/2015Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 10/02/14, 12/02/14. To Court Reporter: Rachelle Hamilton.15-06241
03/24/2015TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Rachelle Hamilton stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 10/02/14, 12/02/14.15-08942
03/27/2015MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause.15-09334
04/13/2015MotionFiled Reply to Response to Order to Show Cause.15-10960
05/13/2015BriefFiled Appellants' Opening Brief.15-14694
05/13/2015AppendixFiled Joint Appendix.15-14698
06/05/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Suspending Briefing.15-17150
06/08/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Address of Attorney for Appellants (Jacob Hafter of Hafter Law).15-17314
09/10/2015Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Dismissed." Before: Hardesty/Saitta/Gibbons/ Author: Gibbons, J. Majority: Gibbons/Hardesty/Saitta. 131 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 68. NNP15-JH/NS/MG15-27331
10/05/2015RemittiturIssued Remittitur.15-30097
10/05/2015Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/20/2015RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on October 8, 2015.15-30097