Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 67228
Short Caption:JEREMIAS (RALPH) VS. STATE (DEATH PENALTY-DIRECT)Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C256769Classification:Criminal Appeal - Death Penalty - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:09/07/2017 at 1:30 PMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:09/07/2017How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/16/2015Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
01/16/2015Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.15-01789
01/16/2015Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. (Second NOA) (Filed by appellant counsel Jonell Thomas/Special PD).15-01791
01/20/2015Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Documents from District Court Clerk. Addendum to NOA packets filed 01/16/2015 - C256769 - Exhibits.15-01909
01/27/2015Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Corrected Sentencing Minutes and Amended Judgment of Conviction - C256769-2 (Death Penalty).15-02908
02/18/2015Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal - Death Direct Volumes 1-27 (via FTP)15-05260
02/20/2015Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Pages 575-583 (SEALED).
02/20/2015Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal pages 3249-3256 (SEALED).
06/03/2015MotionFiled Motion to Supplement the Record on Appeal and Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief.15-17020
06/05/2015MotionFiled Opposition to Motion to Supplement the Record on Appeal and Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief.15-17218
06/22/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion to Supplement Record and Granting Motion to Extend Time. Opening Brief due: August 17, 2015.15-18953
08/17/2015MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief (Second Request).15-24805
08/21/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Opening Brief due: October 1, 2015.15-25357
10/01/2015BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.15-29836
10/01/2015MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Transmit Exhibit 145.15-29837
10/06/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion to Transmit Original Exhibit. Cause appearing, we grant appellant's motion for the transmission of an original exhibit. The clerk of the district court shall have 30 days from the date of this order to transmit to the clerk of this court State's Exhibit 145, identified on the district court exhibit list as "CD-Jeremia's Statement" and admitted on November 4, 2014, in district court case number C256769.15-30274
11/30/2015MotionFiled Motion for Enlargement of Time..15-36340
12/04/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Answering Brief due: January 29, 2016.15-37052
01/29/2016MotionFiled Motion for Enlargement of Time Second Request.. (Answering Brief)16-03209
02/11/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Answering Brief due: March 29, 2016.16-04542
03/29/2016MotionFiled Motion for Enlargement of Time for the Answering Brief (Third Request).16-09737
04/06/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Answering Brief due: April 28, 2016.16-10694
04/28/2016BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.16-13400
06/13/2016MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief (first request).16-18282
06/20/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Reply Brief due: July 13, 2016.16-19228
07/08/2016BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.16-21270
07/08/2016Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
11/17/2016MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Brief.16-36035
01/13/2017BriefFiled Appellant's Notice of Supplemental Authority.17-01402
01/24/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall file the supplemental brief received on November 17, 2016. Supplemental Answering Brief due: 30 days. Brief shall not exceed 5,000 words. Supplemental Reply due: 15 days from the date respondent's supplemental brief is filed. The reply shall not exceed 2,500 words.17-02627
01/24/2017BriefFiled Appellant's Supplemental Brief.17-02629
02/06/2017BriefFiled Respondent's Supplemental Brief.17-04245
02/21/2017BriefFiled Appellant's Supplemental Reply Brief.17-06064
06/23/2017BriefFiled Appellant's Notice of Supplemental Authority.17-20963
07/19/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Thursday, September 7, 2017, at 1:30 p.m. for 60 minutes in Carson City.17-23913
08/22/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.17-28123
09/07/2017Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. "Before the En Banc Court."
03/01/2018Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Stiglich, J. Majority: Stiglich/Douglas/Cherry/Gibbons/Pickering/Hardesty/Parraguirre.134 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 8. EN BANC18-08116
03/13/2018Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant's Petition for Rehearing.18-09684
03/13/2018Filing FeeRehearing Filing fee waived.
04/27/2018Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c).18-16095
04/27/2018MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Stay Remittitur.18-16177
05/03/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion to Stay Remittitur. We hereby stay issuance of the remittitur until August 24, 2018. If the clerk of this court receives written notice by August 24, 2018, from the clerk of the United States Supreme Court that appellant has filed a petition for a writ of certiorari, the stay shall continue in effect until final disposition of the certiorari proceedings. If such notice is not received by August 24, 2018, the remittitur shall issue forthwith.18-16775
07/27/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Notice from US Supreme Court/Certiorari Filed. A petition for a writ of certiorari was filed on July 20, 2018, and placed on the docket as Case No.18-5331.18-28996
11/02/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Notice from US Supreme Court/Certiorari Denied. The petition for a writ of certiorari is denied.18-43138
11/05/2018RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Returned Exhibit (original), State's Exhibit(s) 145 this day. (SC)18-902792
11/05/2018Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
11/16/2018RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on November 9, 2018. (SC)18-902792