The Supreme Court
of Nevada
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 67289
Short Caption:JACKSON VS. GROENENDYKEClassification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Related Case(s):56351, 56551, 59188, 60891, 62620, 64773, 66303, 66932
Lower Court Case(s):Douglas Co. - Ninth Judicial District - CV0363Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Disqualifications:Panel Assigned: Panel
Replacement:
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:01/14/2016 at 10:30 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:01/14/2016How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/26/2015Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Woodburn and Wedge. Check no. 99152. (Appellants Jerald R. Jackson, Jerald R. Jackson 1975 Trust, Irene M. Windholz, and Irene M. Windholz Trust dated August 11, 1992). FILING FEE TRANSFERRED FROM DOCKET NO. 66932 PER ORDER ENTERED ON 1/26/15.
01/26/2015Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. TRANSFERRED FROM DOCKET NO. 66932 PER ORDER 1/26/15.15-02741
01/26/2015Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Amended Notice of Appeal. TRANSFERRED FROM DOCKET NO. 66932 PER ORDER 1/26/15.15-02742
01/26/2015Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (Appellants Jerald R. Jackson, Jerald R. Jackson 1975 Trust, Irene M. Windholz, and Irene M. Windholz Trust dated August 11, 1992)TRANSFERRED FROM DOCKET NO. 66932 PER ORDER 1/26/15.15-02743
01/26/2015Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request Beyond Portions Prepared and Filed Before Appeal Docketed (Appellant's Jerald R. Jackson, Irene M. Windholz). TRANSFERRED FROM DOCKET NO. 66932 PER ORDER 1/26/15.15-02744
04/02/2015MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time to File Appellants' Opening Brief and Related Appendix.15-09976
04/02/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Opening Brief due: May 13, 2015.15-09978
04/22/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Substitution of Counsel (Severin Carlson of Kaempfer Crowell to replace Brooke Shaw Zumpft as counsel for the Respondents).15-12173
05/12/2015BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.15-14568
05/12/2015AppendixFiled Appendix of Appellants Volumes 1-3.15-14569
05/12/2015AppendixFiled Appendix of Appellants Volume 4-5.15-14570
06/05/2015MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Time to File Respondents' Answering Briefs (First Request).15-17174
06/05/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Answering Brief due: July 13, 2015.15-17176
07/09/2015MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Time to File Answering Brief (Second Request) and Extend Time to File Reply Brief (First Request)15-20849
07/13/2015MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Time to File Answering Brief (First Request).15-21129
07/13/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motions. Respondents shall until July 27, 2015, to file and serve the answering briefs. Appellants shall have 30 days from service of the last-filed answering brief to file and serve a single reply brief, if deemed necessary.15-21169
07/27/2015BriefFiled Respondent State Engineer's Answering Brief.15-22636
07/27/2015AppendixFiled Supplemental Appendix to Respondent State Engineer's Answering Brief - Volume I.15-22637
07/27/2015BriefFiled Respondent Edward H. Groenendyke's Answering Brief.15-22734
07/27/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Respondent Edward H. Groenendyke's Answering Brief - Volume I.15-22736
08/27/2015MotionFiled Motion for Permission to File Reply Brief One Day Late.15-26084
09/15/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall file the reply brief received on August 27, 2015.15-27962
09/15/2015BriefFiled Reply Brief of Appellants Jerald R. Jackson, Trustee and Irene M. Windholz, Trustee.15-27964
09/15/2015Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
12/01/2015Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar.15-36386
12/03/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument scheduled for Thursday, January 14, 2016, at 10:30 a.m. for 30 minutes in Carson City.15-36873
12/30/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.15-40091
01/14/2016Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the Northern Nevada Panel. NNP16-MD/MC/MG.
04/07/2016Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before: Douglas/Cherry/Gibbons. Author: Cherry, J. Majority: Cherry/Douglas/Gibbons. 132 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 25. NNP16D-MD/MC/MG16-10875
05/02/2016RemittiturIssued Remittitur.16-13635
05/02/2016Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
05/20/2016RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 4, 2016.16-13635