Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 67331
Short Caption:SCOTT (WILLIAM) VS. DIST. CT. (STATE)Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Carson City - First Judicial DistrictClassification:Original Proceeding - Criminal - Certiorari
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:09/01/2015 at 1:30 PMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:09/01/2015How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/30/2015Filing FeePetition Filing fee waived. Criminal.
01/30/2015Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Certiorari.15-03250
01/30/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ.15-03251
03/11/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Answer Writ Petition. Answer due: 20 days.15-07542
04/01/2015Petition/WritFiled Answer To Petition for Writ of Certiorari.15-09761
07/28/2015Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar.15-22775
07/30/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Tuesday, September 1, 2015, at 1:30 p.m. for 30 minutes in Carson City.15-23085
08/18/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.15-24950
09/01/2015Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision before the En Banc Court.
12/31/2015Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Petition granted." We grant Scott's petition and direct the clerk of this court to issue a writ of certiorari instructing the district court to vacate its order denying Scott's appeal. Before the Court En Banc. Author: Gibbons, J. Majority: Gibbons/Parraguirre/Douglas/Cherry/Saitta. Hardesty, C.J., with whom Pickering, J., agrees, concurring in part and dissenting in part. 131 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 101. EN BANC15-40141
12/31/2015WritIssued Writ with letter. Original and one copy of writ and copy of Opinion mailed to Sally DeSoto for service upon Judge James Todd Russell.15-40164
01/06/2016WritFiled Returned Writ. Original Writ returned. Served on Judge James Todd Russell on January 5, 2016.16-00343
01/25/2016RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur.16-02432
01/25/2016Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/24/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter to Publishers dated March 21, 2016, with corrections to recently filed opinions. Nos. 65390/62357/66410/66474/62931/64946/67331/65143/62649. (Letter entered in 65390 as document no. 16-09339)