Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 67380
Short Caption:ALOTAIBI (MAZEN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C287173Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:06/02/2016How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/10/2015Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
02/10/2015Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)15-04374
02/25/2015Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request.15-06062
03/02/2015Docketing StatementFiled Appellant's Docketing Statement - Criminal Appeal.15-06380
06/05/2015Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Opening Brief and Appendix due: June 24, 2015.15-17233
06/15/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Disassociation of Counsel and Request to be Removed From Electronic Noticing on this Matter. Anjali Webster is no longer associated with the firm Gordon Silver and no longer will be serving as counsel for appellant. Anjali Webster is now with the firm Dickinson Wright.15-18240
06/18/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Law Firm Affiliation and Entry of Appearance. Dominic P Gentile and Vincent Savarese, III are now with the firm, Gentile, Cristalli, Miller, Armeni & Savarese, PLLC, and are no longer with the firm Gordon Silver.15-18621
06/18/2015MotionFiled Motion to Stay Direct Appeal and for Remand to Permit Predicate Filing of Petition for Postconviction Relief and Evidentiary Hearing Thereon.15-18630
06/18/2015MotionFiled Opposition to Motion to Stay Direct Appeal and for Remand to Permit Predicate Filing of Petition for Postconviction Relief and Evidentiary Hearing Thereon.15-18718
06/24/2015MotionFiled Defendant/Appellant Mazen Alotaibi's Motion For Extension of Time Within Which to File Opening Brief (Second Request).15-19237
08/24/2015MotionFiled Defendant/Appellant Mazen Alotaibi's Motion For Extension of Time Within Which to File Opening Brief (Third Request).15-25586
08/25/2015Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 01/28/15. To Court Reporter: Maria Garibay.15-25801
09/04/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant's motion to stay this appeal and remand this matter to the district court is denied. Opening Brief and Appendix due: October 23, 2015. fn2[Appellant's second request for an extension of time is denied as moot.]15-26957
10/26/2015BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.15-32557
10/26/2015AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume I.15-32558
10/26/2015AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume II.15-32560
10/26/2015AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume III.15-32561
10/26/2015AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume IV.15-32563
10/26/2015AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume V.15-32564
11/24/2015MotionFiled Motion for Enlargement of Time. (Answering Brief)15-35938
12/01/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Answering Brief due: January 11, 2016.15-36536
01/11/2016MotionFiled Respondent's Motion for Extension of Time to File the Answering Brief - Second Request.16-00696
01/20/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Answering Brief due: February 1, 2016.16-02022
02/01/2016MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time - 3rd Request (Answering Brief).16-03325
02/03/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent's answering brief due: February 8, 2016.16-03691
02/05/2016BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.16-04003
02/05/2016AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix.16-04004
03/02/2016MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time Appellant Mazen Alotiabi's Motion for Enlargement of Time Within Which to File Reply Brief (First Request)16-06826
03/02/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Reply Brief due date: April 6, 2016.16-06825
04/01/2016MotionFiled Appellant Mazen Alotiabi's Motion for Enlargement of Time Within Which to File Reply Brief (Second Request).16-10228
04/11/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Reply Brief due: April 18, 2016.16-11167
04/19/2016MotionFiled Appellant Mazen Alotaibi's Request for Judicial Notice or, in the Alternative, Motion to Supplement the Record.16-12084
04/19/2016BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.16-12209
04/19/2016Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
04/20/2016MotionFiled State's Opposition to Appellant's Request for Judicial Notice or, in the Alternative, Motion to Supplement to Record.16-12368
04/22/2016MotionFiled Mazen Alotaibi's Reply In Support of Appellant's Request for Judicial Notice or, In the Alternative, Motion to Supplement the Record.16-12753
06/01/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant has filed a motion requesting this court take judicial notice of certain documents in another case or, alternatively, that this court supplement the record with the documents at issue. Respondent opposes the motion and appellant has filed a reply. Having considered the motion, opposition, and reply, we decline to take judicial notice of the specified documents. fn1[ Respondent's request for supplemental briefing is denied as moot.]16-17060
06/02/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting For Decision Without Oral Argument.16-17224
06/13/2016MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Reconsider Submission for Decision Without Oral Argument.16-18373
06/13/2016MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Review Decision of A Single Justice Pursuant to NRAP 27 (C)(2).16-18445
06/14/2016MotionFiled State's Opposition to Appellant's Motion to Reconsider Submission for Decision Without Oral Arguments.16-18456
09/21/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motions. Appellant has filed a motion for panel reconsideration of this court's order denying his motion requesting this court take judicial notice of certain documents in another case or, alternatively, that this court supplement the record with the documents at issue; and a motion for panel reconsideration of this court's order submitting this appeal for decision without oral argument. No good cause appearing, the motions are denied.16-29281
02/28/2017Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." NNP17-JH/RP/LS.17-06857
03/17/2017Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant' Petition for Rehearing of Panel Order of Affirmance.17-09075
04/26/2017Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "we deny the petition for rehearing." NRAP 40(c)(2).17-13853
05/10/2017Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant's Petition for En Banc Reconsideration.17-15704
11/03/2017Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Granting En Banc Reconsideration. This matter shall stand submitted on the briefs and record previously filed.17-37804
11/09/2017Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Hardesty, J. Majority: Hardesty/Cherry/Douglas/Gibbons/Pickering/Parraguirre.Stiglich. 133 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 81. EN BANC17-38584
12/04/2017RemittiturIssued Remittitur.17-41550
12/04/2017Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/29/2017RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on December 14, 2017.17-41550
02/21/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Notice from US Supreme Court/Certiorari Filed. A petition for a writ of certiorari was filed February 7, 2018 and placed on the docket as Case No. 17-1128.18-06788
04/20/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Notice from US Supreme Court/Certiorari Denied. The petition for a writ of certiorari is denied.18-15208