Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 67428
Short Caption:SHUE (JOSHUA) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C288172Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:12/05/2016 at 1:30 PMOral Argument Location:Regional Justice Center
Submission Date:12/05/2016How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/19/2015Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
02/19/2015Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)15-05392
03/06/2015Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 03/13/13 (Vincent) 10/08/13, 11/07/13, 12/17/13, 02/04/14, 04/08/14, 05/19/14, 05/29/14, 08/21/14, 08/25/14, 08/26/14, 08/27/14, 12/09/14, 01/05/15 (Olsen) 02/20/14, 08/22/14, 08/28/14 (Slattery) 08/29/14 (Jacoby) 08/19/14 (Winn). To Court Reporter: Renee Vincent, Janie Olsen, Patti Slattery, Jill Jacoby and Debbie Winn.15-06990
03/06/2015Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement - Criminal Appeals.15-06991
03/16/2015TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Michelle L. Ramsey stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 08/22/14.15-07950
04/07/2015TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Renee Vincent stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 03/13/13.15-10420
04/21/2015TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Recorder. Janie Olsen stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: dates not provided.15-11990
06/16/2015MotionFiled Stipulation to File Opening Brief.15-18325
06/16/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Opening Brief due date: July 20, 2015.15-18354
07/20/2015BriefFiled Opening Brief.15-21938
07/20/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume I.15-21939
07/20/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume II.15-21941
07/20/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume III.15-21942
07/21/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume IIV.15-21944
07/21/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume V.15-21945
07/21/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume VI.15-21946
07/21/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume VII.15-21947
07/21/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume VIII.15-21948
08/19/2015MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time - First Request (Answering Brief).15-25058
08/20/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Answering Brief due: October 5, 2015.15-25183
10/05/2015MotionFiled Respondent's Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Answering Brief - Second Request.15-30153
10/12/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Answering Brief due: November 4, 2015.15-30898
11/04/2015BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.15-33637
12/04/2015BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.15-37029
12/04/2015MotionFiled Motion Requesting Transmittal of Exhibits Pursuant to NRAP 30(d).15-37030
12/04/2015Case Status UpdateFast Track Briefing Completed.
12/11/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting in Part Motion to Transmit Exhibits. The clerk of the district court shall have 20 days from the date of this order to transmit State's Exhibit 1, admitted on August 26, 2014, in case number C-13-288172-1. Upon receipt, the clerk of this court shall place the exhibit under seal. The motion is denied as to State's Exhibits 2, 3-11, and 75. Appellant shall have 11 days from the date of this order to submit copies of these exhibits in a supplemental appendix. Appellant shall submit the supplemental appendix in a sealed envelope via mail. Upon receipt, the clerk of this court shall file the supplemental appendix under seal.15-37877
12/23/2015AppendixFiled Supplemental Appendix. (SEALED pages 1522-1532)
01/13/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting Appeal For Decision Without Oral Argument. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein.16-01165
07/01/2016MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Supplement His Opening Brief.16-20728
07/05/2016MotionFiled Respondent's Opposition to Motion to Supplement Appellant's Opening Brief.16-20798
07/07/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant has filed a motion to supplement his opening brief with argument related to issues raised by this court's recent decision in Castaneda v. State, 132 Nev., Adv. Op. 44, ___ P.3d ___ (2016). Respondent opposes the motion. Cause appearing, the motion is granted to the following extent. Appellant shall have 15 days from the date of this order to file a supplement to his opening brief, of no more than 10 pages in length, that addresses only the issues raised by this court's decision in Castaneda. Respondent shall have 7 days from the filing of the supplement to file and serve a response of no more than 10 pages in length. No reply will be allowed.16-21182
07/19/2016BriefFiled Appellant's Supplement to his Opening Brief.16-22471
07/21/2016BriefFiled Supplement to Answering Brief.16-22770
11/03/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on Monday, December 5, 2016, @ 1:30 p.m. in Las Vegas.16-34312
11/21/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.16-36213
12/05/2016Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court.
12/14/2017Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed in part, reversed in part, vacated in part, and remanded." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Parraguirre, J. Majority: Parraguirre/Cherry/Douglas/Gibbons/Pickering/Hardesty/Stiglich. 133 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 99. EN BANC17-43084
01/02/2018Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant's Petition for Rehearing.18-00013
02/23/2018Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c).18-07162
02/27/2018MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Stay of Remittitur Pending Application for Certiorari to the United States Supreme Court.18-07751
03/08/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion to Stay Remittitur. We hereby stay issuance of the remittitur until June 25, 2018. If the clerk of this court receives written notice by June 25, 2018, from the clerk of the United States Supreme Court that appellant has filed a petition for a writ of certiorari, the stay shall continue in effect until final disposition of the certiorari proceedings. If such notice is not received by June 25, 2018, the remittitur shall issue forthwith.18-09123
06/05/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Notice from US Supreme Court/Certiorari Filed. A petition for a writ of certiorari was filed on May 23,2018, and placed on the docket as Case No. 17-9119.18-21381
10/04/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Notice from US Supreme Court/Certiorari Denied. The petition for a writ of certiorari is denied.18-39052
10/15/2018RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Returned Original State's Exhibit(s) 1 this day.18-40310
10/15/2018Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/02/2018RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on October 17, 2018.18-40310