Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 67455
Short Caption:OGLESBY (JEVON) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):67455-COA, 69224, 69224-COA, 70401, 70401-COA, 78233
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C282319Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/24/2015Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
02/24/2015Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Filed certified copy of notice of appeal. (Fast Track Notice issued to counsel for appellant.)15-05924
02/24/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Criminal. Due date: 10 days15-05928
03/18/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Case Appeal Statement due: 5 days.15-08221
03/18/2015Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement.15-08347
03/20/2015Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement.15-08494
03/20/2015AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix.15-08495
04/09/2015MotionFiled Motion for Enlargement of Time.15-10758
04/16/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Fast Track Response due: May 11, 2015.15-11366
04/17/2015Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response.15-11509
04/20/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Election Not to File a Reply to Fast Track Response.15-11820
04/20/2015Case Status UpdateFast Track Briefing Completed.
05/04/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Transfer to Court of Appeals.15-13607
07/14/2015Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals-MG/JT/AS
08/10/2015Case Status UpdateTransferred from Court of Appeals.
08/10/2015RemittiturIssued Remittitur.15-24062
08/10/2015Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/20/2015RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on August 12, 2015.15-24062