Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 67465
Short Caption:STATE, DEP'T OF TRANSP. VS. DIST. CT. (JORGENSON & KOKA, LLP)Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A686840Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus/Prohibition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:10/22/2015How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/25/2015Filing FeePetition Filing fee waived. State/County/Municipality.
02/25/2015Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition.15-06044
02/25/2015AppendixFiled Joint Appendix - Volume 1.15-06046
02/25/2015AppendixFiled Joint Appendix - Volume 2.15-06047
02/26/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Fling of Petition for Writ of Prohibition or Mandamus.15-06120
03/26/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer. Answer due: 30 days. fn1 [If any of the real parties in interest do not believe that they are interested parties in this writ proceeding, they shall notify this court within that same time frame that they do not intend to file an answer for that reason.]15-09253
04/21/2015Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Answer to the Writ Petition due: May 11, 2015. (Real Party in Interest PWREO Eastern and St. Rose, LLC).15-11956
04/22/2015Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Answer to Writ Petition due: May 11, 2015. (Real Party in Interest Jorgenson & Koka, LLP).15-12150
05/12/2015Petition/WritFiled Real Party in Interest, Jorgenson & Koka, LLP's and PWREO Eastern and St. Rose, LLC's Answer to Petition for Writ of Prohibition or Mandamus.15-14421
05/12/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Answer to Petition for Writ.15-14441
05/12/2015Notice/IncomingFiled NRAP 26.1 Disclosure Statement.15-14442
05/13/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Errata to Supplemental Appendix.15-14682
05/20/2015Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Reply to Answer to Writ Petition due: June 10, 2015.15-15444
06/10/2015Petition/WritFiled Petitioner NDOT's Reply Brief in Support of Petition for Writ of Prohibition or Mandamus.15-17726
10/22/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision without Oral Argument.15-32238
02/25/2016Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Petition denied." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Hardesty, J. Majority: Hardesty/Parraguirre/Douglas/Cherry/Saitta/Gibbons/Pickering. 132 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 10. EN BANC16-06013
03/21/2016RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur.16-08793
03/21/2016Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
05/12/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter (dated 5/3/16) to Publishers with corrections to recently filed opinions. Nos. 65424/66816/67465/53626/62493/69580/65681/66473 (Letter entered in Docket No. 65424 as document no. 16-14923.)