The Supreme Court
of Nevada
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Administrative Case: ADKT 0504
Short Caption:IN RE: AMENDMENT TO NRAP 36 AND REPEAL SCR 123Classification:Administrative - ADKT - ADKT
Case Status:Scheduled for Hearing
Filed Date:02/27/2015Public Hearing:07/01/2015 at 1:00 PM (Nevada Supreme Court Courtroom, Carson City)
04/04/2017 at 2:30 PM (Nevada Supreme Court Courtroom, Las Vegas)
Closed Date:10/14/2016

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/27/2015Administrative CaseFiled Petition.15-06261
04/28/2015Administrative CaseFiled Order Setting Public Hearing. A copy of the petition and the proposed amendments are attached. Hearing to be held Wednesday, July 1, 2015, at 1 p.m. in the Supreme Court Courtroom in Carson City. Videoconferenced to RJC in Las Vegas. Original and 8 copies of written comments due to Clerk by 5 p.m. on June 26, 2015. Persons interested in participating must notify the Clerk no later than June 26, 2015.15-12888
05/08/2015Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Nadia von Magdenko with von Magdenko & Associates.15-14171
05/26/2015Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Murdock & Associates.15-16013
06/25/2015Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Bailey Kennedy Attorneys at Law.15-19431
06/25/2015Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Seth T Floyd, Chair of the Appellate Litigation Section State Bar of Nevada.15-19477
06/25/2015Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Kirk C Johnson with Robertson, Johnson, Miller & Williamson.15-19488
06/26/2015Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Sarah Suter with Las Vegas Defense Lawyers.15-19547
06/26/2015Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Hon Charles J Hoskin, District Judge, Eighth Judicial District Court, Family Division.15-19551
06/26/2015Administrative CaseFiled Comments from George T Bochanis, Esq.15-19553
06/29/2015Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Michael Lowry with Thorndal, Armstrong, Delk, Balkenbush & Eisinger.15-19759
06/30/2015Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Steve Morris with Morris Law Group.
06/30/2015Administrative CaseFiled Comments from numerous Nevada attorneys.
06/30/2015Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Bruce Shapiro with Pecos Law Group.
06/30/2015Administrative CaseFiled Comments from J Randall Jones with Kemp, Jones & Couthard.
06/30/2015Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Christensen Law.15-20016
06/30/2015Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Robert W Lueck, LTD.15-20017
07/01/2015Administrative CasePublic Hearing Held. Public Hearing held on the Administrative Docket.
07/06/2015Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Steve Morris with Morris Law Group.15-20359
07/06/2015Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Numerous Nevada attorneys.15-20361
07/06/2015Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Bruce Shapiro with Pecos Law Group.15-20362
07/06/2015Administrative CaseFiled Comments from J Randall Jones with Kemp, Jones & Couthard.15-20363
07/20/2015Administrative CaseFiled Letter from numerous Nevada attorneys regarding the expression of support of ADKT 0504.15-21783
11/12/2015Administrative CaseFiled Order Amending Nevada Rule of Appellate Procedure 36 and Repealing Supreme Court Rule 123. Exhibit A attached. Effective January 1, 2016 and shall apply to orders entered by this court on or after that date.15-34478
10/14/2016Administrative CaseCase Closed.
02/28/2017Administrative CaseCase Reopened.
02/28/2017Administrative CaseFiled Petition to Amend Nevada Rule of Appellate Procedure 36. Exhibit A attached.Y17-06759
03/07/2017Administrative CaseFiled Order Scheduling Public Hearing and Requesting Public Comment. Hearing will be held on Tuesday, April 4, 2017, at 2:30 p.m. in the Nevada Supreme Court Courtroom, Las Vegas. Video-conferenced to the Nevada Supreme Court Courtroom, Carson City. Written comments invited. Original and 8 copies of written comments due by 5:00 p.m. on March 28, 2017. Persons interested in participating in the hearing must notify the Clerk no later than March 28, 2017.17-07706