The Supreme Court
of Nevada
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 67519
Short Caption:HARTE (SHAWN) VS. STATEClassification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Related Case(s):34195, 34196, 34227, 43877, 49929, 50161
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR980074Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Disqualifications:Panel Assigned: Panel
Replacement:
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:03/16/2016 at 10:00 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:03/16/2016How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/06/2015Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
03/06/2015Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)15-06989
03/13/2015Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statememt Criminal Appeals.15-07826
04/21/2015TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. John Molezzo stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: December 17, 2014, January 16, 2015, January 21, 2015, January 26-30, 2015, and February 2, 2015.15-12001
07/02/2015MotionFiled Stipulation for an Extension to Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix.15-20190
07/02/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Opening Brief and Appendix due: August 5, 2015.15-20198
08/03/2015MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time to File the Opening Brief and Joint Appendix.15-23353
08/07/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Opening Brief and Appendix due: September 8, 2015.15-23851
08/28/2015BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.15-26180
08/28/2015AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume One.15-26182
08/28/2015AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume Two.15-26183
08/28/2015AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume Three.15-26184
08/28/2015AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume Five.15-26186
08/28/2015AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume Four.15-26187
08/28/2015AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume Six.15-26188
08/28/2015AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume Seven.15-26189
09/22/2015BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.15-28664
10/21/2015MotionFiled Stipulation (30-day extension of time to file Reply Brief).15-32019
10/21/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Reply Brief due date: November 23, 2015.15-32074
11/17/2015BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.15-35100
11/17/2015Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
02/22/2016Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar.16-05643
02/25/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Wednesday, March 16, 2016, at 10:00 a.m. for 30 minutes in Carson City.16-06114
03/02/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.16-06790
03/16/2016Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. To the NNP16D-MD/MC/MG.
06/02/2016Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before: Douglas/Cherry/Gibbons. Author: Cherry, J. Majority: Cherry/Douglas. Gibbons, J., concurring in part and dissenting in part. 132 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 40. NNP16D-MD/MC/MG16-17122
06/27/2016RemittiturIssued Remittitur.16-19980
06/27/2016Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/08/2016RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on June 30, 2016.16-19980
08/24/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Issued Letter to Publishers regarding corrections to recently filed opinions. Nos. 58101/67835/67519/65598/67786/65364 (Document entered in case no. 58101 document no. 16-26404.)