Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Administrative Case: ADKT 0507
Short Caption:IN RE: CREATION OF A COMMISSION ON GUARDIANSHIPSCourt:Supreme Court
Classification:Administrative - ADKT - ADKTCase Status:Scheduled for Hearing
Filed Date:05/21/2015Public Hearing:07/18/2018 at 2:00 PM (Nevada Supremem Court Courtroom, Carson City)
Closed Date:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/21/2015Administrative CaseFiled Petition.15-15613
06/08/2015Administrative CaseFiled Order. On May 21, 2015, a petition seeking the creation of a statewide commission was filed. This court has concluded that such a commission should be appointed and should file a report with this court on its findings and recommendations by December 31, 2015. The chief justice shall appoint and chair a commission of no more than 20 members.15-17375
06/11/2015Administrative CaseFiled Letter from Rana Goodman regarding interest to serve as a member on the commission.15-17832
06/25/2015Administrative CaseFiled Order. This court created a statewide commission to study the creation and administration of guardianships. This court further authorized the chief justice to appoint a commission of no more than 20 members. The court has determined that expansion of the commission is warranted. The chief justice is hereby authorized to appoint and chair a commission of no more than 30 members.15-19502
06/26/2015Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Commission Members. The individuals listed in Exhibit A are appointed to the Commission.15-19627
07/23/2015Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Commission Members. Christine Smith's membership was changed from ex officio member to that of a full member. Susan Hoy's affiliation has been corrected. Exhibit A reflects the current list of those appointed to the Commission.15-22337
07/24/2015Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Mary Fazzalaro.15-22519
09/11/2015Administrative CaseLetter received during hearing on August 17, 2015 from Sandy Lewis.15-27623
10/20/2015Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Keith J Tierney.15-31943
12/02/2015Administrative CaseFiled Order. On June 8, 2015, this court entered and order creating a commission in this matter and directing the commission to file a report with this court on its findings and recommendations by December 31, 2015. The deadline for the report is hereby extended to July 1, 2016.15-36776
12/10/2015Administrative CaseFiled Supplement to Comments from Keith J. Tierney.15-37680
06/20/2016Administrative CaseFiled Order. Deadline for report of findings and recommendations is hereby extended an additional 30 days to August 1, 2016.16-19163
06/20/2016Administrative CaseFiled Amended Order. Deadline for report of findings and recommendations is hereby extended to September 30, 2016.16-19217
06/23/2016Administrative CaseFiled Letter from Justice Hardesty regarding deadline for report.16-19622
07/22/2016Administrative CaseFiled Order. The commission asked this court to clarify the application of the rules and code to proceedings under NRS Chapter 159 (Guardianships).16-22815
09/14/2016Administrative CaseFiled Comments for Guardianship Commission from Sandra Reed.16-28542
09/29/2016Administrative CaseFiled Final Report Nevada Supreme Court's Commission to Study Administration of Guardianships in Nevada's Courts.
09/29/2016Administrative CaseFiled Filed Appendix to the Final Report Nevada Supreme Court's Commission to Study Administration of Guardianships in Nevada's Courts.
08/02/2017Administrative CaseFiled Order. A permanent Guardianship Commission be created by September 30, 2017, to study and make recommendations, providing a report to the court by January 31, 2018. The Supreme Court will appoint up to 15 members to serve on the permanent Guardianship Commission. The Supreme Court solicits those persons interested in serving on the permanent Commission to submit letters of interest to the Clerk of the Nevada Supreme Court by 4:00 p.m. on September 6, 2017.17-25756
08/07/2017Administrative CaseFiled Letter from Homa Sayyar Woodrum with the Department of Health and Human Services regarding consideration for participation on the permanent Nevada Guardianship Commission. - FAX -17-26085
08/07/2017Administrative CaseFiled Letter from Egan Walker, District Judge of the Second Judicial District Court regarding consideration for participation on the permanent Nevada Guardianship Commission.17-26147
08/07/2017Administrative CaseFiled Letter from attorney John C Smith regarding consideration for participation on the permanent Nevada Guardianship Commission.17-26212
08/07/2017Administrative CaseFiled Letter from Homa Sayyar Woodrum with the Department of Health and Human Services regarding consideration for participation on the permanent Nevada Guardianship Commission. - ORIGINAL -17-26217
08/10/2017Administrative CaseFiled Letter from Vincent Ochoa, District Judge of the Eighth Judicial District Court regarding consideration for participation on the permanent Nevada Guardianship Commission.17-26827
08/16/2017Administrative CaseFiled Letter from Dawna Richert regarding consideration for participation on the permanent Nevada Guardianship Commission.17-27479
08/16/2017Administrative CaseFiled Letter from Jennifer H Rains with the Washoe County Public Defender regarding consideration for participation on the permanent Nevada Guardianship Commission.17-27480
08/16/2017Administrative CaseFiled Letter from Rana Goodman regarding consideration for participation on the permanent Nevada Guardianship Commission.17-27481
08/16/2017Administrative CaseFiled Letter from John P Michaelson with Michaelson & Associates regarding consideration for participation on the permanent Nevada Guardianship Commission.17-27482
08/22/2017Administrative CaseFiled Letter from Lynn N Hughes with Roberts Stoffel regarding consideration for participation on the permanent Nevada Guardianship Commission.17-28181
08/30/2017Administrative CaseFiled Letter from Mary Bryant, Director, Path to Independence, UNR regarding consideration for participation on the permanent Nevada Guardianship Commission.17-29025
08/30/2017Administrative CaseFiled Letter from Henry W Cavallera regarding consideration for participation on the permanent Nevada Guardianship Commission.17-29145
08/30/2017Administrative CaseFiled Letter from Jim Berchtold with the Legal Aid Center of Southern Nevada, Inc regarding consideration for participation on the permanent Nevada Guardianship Commission.17-29146
09/01/2017Administrative CaseFiled Letter from Kim G Rowe with Maupin Cox Legoy regarding consideration for Dania Reid to be recommended to participate on the permanent Nevada Guardianship Commission.17-29472
09/01/2017Administrative CaseFiled Letter from Dania Reid with Washoe County District Attorney with regarding consideration for participation on the permanent Nevada Guardianship Commission.17-29473
09/05/2017Administrative CaseFiled Letter from Karen Kelly with the Clark County Public Guardian's Office regarding consideration for participation on the permanent Nevada Guardianship Commission.17-29603
09/05/2017Administrative CaseFiled Letter from Debra M Amens with Amens Law regarding consideration for participation on the permanent Nevada Guardianship Commission.17-29680
09/06/2017Administrative CaseFiled Letter from Honorable Gloria J Sturman with Eighth Judicial District Court regarding consideration for participation on the permanent Nevada Guardianship Commission. -FAX-17-29788
09/06/2017Administrative CaseFiled Letter from Lynda Hascheff with AARP Nevada regarding consideration for participation on the permanent Nevada Guardianship Commission.17-29789
09/06/2017Administrative CaseFiled Letter from Shelly Register with Guardianship Services of Nevada regarding consideration for participation on the permanent Nevada Guardianship Commission.17-29791
09/06/2017Administrative CaseFiled Letter from Elizabeth Brickfield with Dickinson Wright PLLC regarding consideration for participation on the permanent Nevada Guardianship Commission.17-29888
09/06/2017Administrative CaseFiled Letter from Jennifer A Salem with Origins Legal Group regarding consideration for participation on the permanent Nevada Guardianship Commission.17-29890
09/06/2017Administrative CaseFiled Letter from Michael W Keane with Woodburn Wedge regarding consideration for participation on the permanent Nevada Guardianship Commission.17-29895
09/06/2017Administrative CaseFiled Letter from Shelly Register with Guardianship Services of Nevada regarding consideration for participation on the permanent Nevada Guardianship Commission. (ORIGINAL)17-29923
09/08/2017Administrative CaseFiled Letter from Honorable Gloria J Sturman with Eighth Judicial District Court regarding consideration for participation on the permanent Nevada Guardianship Commission. -ORIGINAL-17-30213
09/08/2017Administrative CaseFiled Letter from Ross E Evans with Solomon Dwiggins Freer regarding consideration for participation on the permanent Nevada Guardianship Commission.17-30245
09/14/2017Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing permanent Guardianship Commission Members. Honorable James W. Hardesty, Justice, is designated as the chairperson of the permanent Guardianship Commission. Individuals listed in Exhibit A are appointed to the permanent Guardianship Commission and shall serve until further order of the court.17-30942
01/24/2018Administrative CaseFiled Order. The Commission shall have until May 31, 2018, to provide a report of its recommendations to the court.18-03479
01/25/2018Administrative CaseFiled Order. Danielle Christensen, and attorney with Washoe Legal Services, is appointed to the permanent Guardianship Commission, effective December 20, 2017, and shall serve until further order of the court.18-03504
05/30/2018Administrative CaseFiled First Interim Report of the Guardianship Comission.18-20489
05/31/2018Administrative CaseFiled Order Scheduling Public Hearing and requesting Public Comment. Hearing will be held on Wednesday, July 18, 2018, at 1:30 p.m. in the Nevada Supreme Courtroom, Carson City. Video-conferenced to the Nevada Supreme Courtroom, Las Vegas. Written comments invited. Due by July 5, 2018, at 5:00 p.m. Persons interested in participating in the hearing must notify the Clerk by July 5, 2018.18-20646
06/14/2018Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Jim Berchtold and Stephanie McDonald with Legal Aid center.18-22831
06/15/2018Administrative CaseFiled Order Regarding Public Hearing. On May 31, 2018, this court scheduled a public hearing in this matter for July 18, 2018, at 1:30 p.m. To accommodate this court's calendar, the public hearing will begin at 2:00 p.m. in Carson City. Video-conferenced to Las Vegas.18-23037
07/05/2018Administrative CaseFiled Washoe Legal Services participation in the hearing scheduled for July 18th at 2:00 pm. The attorneys that plan to participate include David D. Spitzer, Esq; Jennifer M. Richards, Esq.; and Lisa Evans, Esq.18-25570
07/05/2018Administrative CaseFiled Comments from David T Ochoa with Lipson Neilson.18-25574
07/06/2018Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Mark C Hafer, Esq of Mushkin Cica Coppedge.18-25575
07/18/2018Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Hon Frances Doherty, Second Judicial District Court.18-27373
07/18/2018Administrative CasePublic Hearing Held. Public Hearing held on the Administrative Docket.
07/19/2018Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Guardianship Commission Members. Jennifer Richards is appointed to replace Danielle Christenson, effective immediately.18-27589
07/20/2018Administrative CaseFiled Order inviting Additional Public Comment. Comments may be submitted to the court electronically or in hard-copy format. All comments must be submitted by 5:00 p.m., August 3, 2018.18-27845
08/02/2018Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Kathleen McCloskey, Guardianship Compliance Manager Supreme Court of Nevada and Mallory Nelson, Case Compliance Specialist Second Judicial District Court.18-29679
08/06/2018Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Washoe Legal Services.18-30006
08/06/2018Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Jim Berchtold with Legal Aid Center of Southern Nevada.18-30007
08/07/2018Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Jim Berchtold with Legal Aid Center of Southern Nevada. (original)18-30187
09/10/2018Administrative CaseFiled Order Approving Statewide Rules for Guardianship. Exhibit A attached. Effective 30 days from the date of this order.18-35095
09/26/2018Administrative CaseFiled Order Approving Statewide Forms for Guardianship. Exhibit A attached. Effective 30 days from the date of this order.18-37719
01/02/2019Administrative CaseFiled Supplement to First Interim Report of the Guardianship Commission.19-00051
02/08/2019Administrative CaseFiled Order re: Statewide Rules for Guardianship. Attached Exhibit A.19-06211
09/12/2019Administrative CaseFiled Second Supplement to First Interim Report of the Guardianship Commission.19-38158
09/18/2019Administrative CaseFiled Order Scheduling Public Hearing and Requesting Public Comment. Exhibit A and B attached. Hearing to be held on Thursday, October 17, 2019, at 2:00 p.m. in the Nevada Supreme Court Courtroom in Las Vegas. Videoconferenced to the Nevada Supreme Court Courtroom in Carson City. Comments may be submitted electronically or in hard-copy format due to the Clerk by 5 p.m. on October 9, 2019. Persons interested in participating in the hearing must notify the Clerk no later than October 9, 2019.19-38906
09/20/2019Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Guardianship Commission Members.19-39327
10/07/2019Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Henry W. Cavallera, member of the Permanent Guardianship Commission.19-41416
10/07/2019Administrative CaseFiled Appendix I to Henry W. Cavallera's comments.19-41435
10/07/2019Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Dania Reid with Washoe County District Attorney and Co-Chair of the Rules Subcommittee of the Permanent Guardianship Commission.19-41441
10/09/2019Administrative CaseFiled Comments from the Hon. Tamatha Schreinert and Sabrina Sweet with the Second Judicial District Court.19-41856
10/11/2019Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Guardianship Commission Member. The Honorable Linda Marquis is appointed to the permanent Guardianship Commission to represent the Eighth Judicial District Court, effective immediately.19-42175
10/16/2019Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Margaret Crowley, Esq.19-42796
10/17/2019Administrative CasePublic Hearing Held. Public Hearing held on the Administrative Docket. (SC)
11/07/2019Administrative CaseFiled Order Approving Additional Statewide Rules for Guardianship. Exhibit A attached. Effective 30 days from the date of this order.19-45886