Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 67580
Short Caption:NASBY (BRENDAN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):35319, 47130, 58579, 67476, 67704, 68039, 70626, 70626-COA, 73412, 73412-COA, 80443, 80443-COA, 81484, 81484-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C154293Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Gibbons, SaittaCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:05/22/2015How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/17/2015Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
03/17/2015Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.15-08152
03/17/2015OtherJustice Mark Gibbons disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Sat in District Court Proceedings
03/17/2015OtherJustice Nancy M. Saitta disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Sat in District Court Proceedings
03/24/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Entry and Transmission of Written Order. District Court Order due: 60 days.15-08911
03/31/2015Order/IncomingFiled District court order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on 03/30/15. Transmission of Written Order (Response to Supreme Court Order dated 03/24/2015 - C154293-2).15-09730
04/09/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Transmission of Record. Record due: 60 days.15-10718
05/22/2015Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal volumes 1-11. Via FTP.15-15770
05/22/2015Case Status UpdateSubmitted for Decision.
05/29/2015Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled SEALED PSI Report.
09/11/2015Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." CHERRY, J., concurring. SNP15-RP/MD/MC.15-27547
09/15/2015OtherReturned Unfiled Document- "Motion to Disqualify a Judge."
10/07/2015RemittiturIssued Remittitur.15-30462
10/07/2015Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/20/2015RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on October 12, 2015.15-30462