The Supreme Court
of Nevada
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 67656
Short Caption:BOWMAN (FREDRICK) VS. STATEClassification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR140708Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Disqualifications:Panel Assigned: En Banc
Replacement:
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:01/14/2016 at 11:30 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:01/14/2016How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/26/2015Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
03/26/2015Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Filed certified copy of notice of appeal. (Fast Track Notice issued to counsel for appellant.)15-09246
03/26/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Request Rough Draft Transcripts. Due date: 10 days.15-09248
04/07/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Motion for Transcripts to be at States Expense.15-10379
04/07/2015Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 12/01/14, 12/02/14, 12/03/14, 01/29/15, 02/19/15, 02/26/15. To Court Reporter: R. Walker.15-10381
04/13/2015TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Isolde Zihn stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 02/26/15.15-11033
04/21/2015TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Randi Lee Walker stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 1/29/15.15-12126
04/23/2015TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter Lesley A. Clarkson stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 12/02/14.15-12367
04/28/2015TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Debora L. Cecere stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 12/03/14.15-12860
04/29/2015TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter Corrie L. Wolden stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 12/01/14.15-13063
05/04/2015Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: May 12, 2015.15-13511
05/05/2015TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Erin T. Ferretto stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 12/03/14.15-13721
05/11/2015MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time (Fast Track Statement and Appendix).15-14292
05/13/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: June 11, 2015.15-14728
06/11/2015Fast Track BriefFiled Appellant Fast Track Statement.15-17766
06/11/2015AppendixFiled Joint Appendix.15-17825
07/02/2015Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Response due: July 9, 2015.15-20200
07/10/2015Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response.15-20942
08/12/2015Case Status UpdateFast Track Briefing Completed. No Reply Filed.
12/01/2015Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar.15-36395
12/03/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument scheduled for Thursday, January 14, 2016, at 11:30 a.m. for 30 minutes in Carson City.15-36874
12/30/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.15-40092
01/14/2016Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the Northern Nevada Panel. NNP16-MD/MC/MG.
04/28/2016Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Reversed and remanded." Before: Douglas/Cherry/Gibbons. Author: Gibbons, J. Majority: Gibbons/Douglas/Cherry. 132 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 30. NNP16D-MD/MC/MG (OPINION WITHDRAWN PER ORDER FILED 10/27/16)16-13315
05/16/2016Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant's Petition for Rehearing.16-15306
05/24/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer To Petition For Rehearing. Appellant's Answer due: 15 days. fn1[Although entitled "Appellant's Petition for Rehearing," it is evident from the body of the petition that it is filed on behalf of respondent.]16-16244
06/06/2016Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Answer to Petition for Rehearing.16-17458
06/23/2016Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c).16-19680
07/06/2016Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Respondent's Petition for En Banc Reconsideration.16-20856
07/22/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer to Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. Appellant's Answer due: 15 days.16-22802
08/08/2016Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant's Answer to Petition for En Banc Reconsideration.16-24391
10/27/2016Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Granting En Banc Reconsideration, Withdrawing opinion, and Submitting Appeal for Decision on En Banc Reconsideration. Fn1{The Honorable Nancy M. Saitta, Justice, having retired, this matter was decided by a six-justice court.]16-33620
10/27/2016Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Petition granted; reversed and remanded." Fn1[The Honorable Nancy M. Saitta, Justice, having retired, this matter was decided by a six-justice court.] Before the Court En Banc. Author: Gibbons, J. Majority: Gibbons/Parraguirre/Hardesty/Douglas/Cherry/Pickering. 132 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 74. EN BANC16-33621
11/07/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter to Publishers regarding Corrections to recently filed opinions. Nos. 67656/64349;64452;65497/64702;65007;65172/65562/66697/66157/67660/56329/6916916-34632
11/21/2016RemittiturIssued Remittitur.16-36221
11/21/2016Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/29/2016RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on November 22, 2016.16-36221