The Supreme Court
of Nevada
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 67660
Short Caption:FRITZ VS. WASHOE CNTY.Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV1300756Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Disqualifications:Panel Assigned: En Banc
Replacement:
To SP/Judge:03/30/2015 / Georgeson, JamesSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:03/17/2016 at 10:00 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:03/17/2016How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/27/2015Filing FeeFiling fee due for Appeal. Filing fee will be forwarded by the District Court.
03/27/2015Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)15-09353
03/27/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed.15-09356
03/30/2015Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Luke Andrew Busby LTD. Check No. 1043.
03/30/2015Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: James Georgeson.15-09563
04/06/2015Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement - Civil Appeals.15-10173
04/06/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge (Docketing Statement).15-10177
04/06/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Certficate of Service. (Settlement Judge)15-10250
04/22/2015Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for May 21, 2015, 9:00 a.m.15-12218
05/22/2015Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter.15-15808
06/01/2015Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request.15-16644
06/04/2015Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant: 45 days to file the opening brief and appendix.15-17054
06/29/2015AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Vol. 1.15-19801
06/29/2015AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Vol. 2.15-19802
06/29/2015AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Vol. 3.15-19803
06/29/2015AppendixFiled Master Alphabetical Index for Joint Appendix.15-19804
06/29/2015BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.15-19824
07/01/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 1.15-20122
07/01/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 2.15-20123
07/01/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 3.15-20124
07/20/2015MotionFiled Stipulation for Extension of Time (Answering Brief).15-21888
07/20/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Answering Brief due: August 28, 2015.15-21891
08/21/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance (Stephan Hollandsworth as counsel for the Respondent).15-25444
08/21/2015MotionFiled Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief.15-25448
08/28/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Answering Brief due: September 18, 2015.15-26157
09/21/2015BriefFiled Answering Brief of Respondent Washoe County.15-28426
09/25/2015BriefFiled Reply Brief.15-29229
09/25/2015Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
12/23/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This court has determined that oral argument may be of assistance in resolving this matter. Accordingly, this matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar.15-39520
02/04/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Thursday, March 17, 2016, at 10:00 am for 30 minutes in Carson City.16-03870
03/02/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.16-06794
03/17/2016Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. To the Northern Nevada Panel. NNP16D-MD/MC/MG.
08/04/2016Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Reversed and remanded." Before: Douglas/Cherry/Gibbons. Author: Douglas, J. Majority: Douglas/Cherry/Gibbons. 132 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 57. NNP16D-MD/MC/MG16-24150
08/22/2016Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Respondent's Petition for Rehearing.16-26080
08/24/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer To Petition For Rehearing. Answer due: 15 days.16-26359
08/25/2016Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Answer to Petition for Rehearing.16-26537
10/27/2016Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c).16-33751
11/07/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter to Publishers regarding Corrections to recently filed opinions. Nos. 67656/64349;64452;65497/64702;65007;65172/65562/66697/66157/67660/56329/69169 (Filed in docket no. 67656 document no. 16-34632)
11/09/2016Notice/IncomingFiled Attorney Luke A. Busby's Notice of Unavailability of Counsel.16-34971
11/15/2016Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Respondent's Petition for En Banc Reconsideration.16-35470
11/22/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Answer Rehearing/En Banc Reconsideration. Answer due: 15 days.16-36385
11/28/2016Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant's Answer to Petition for En Banc Reconsideration.16-36674
12/21/2016Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. Having considered the petition on file herein, we have concluded that en banc reconsideration is not warranted. NRAP 40A. Accordingly, we "ORDER the petition DENIED." EN BANC.16-39617
01/19/2017RemittiturIssued Remittitur.17-02007
01/19/2017Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/02/2017RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on January 25, 2017.17-02007