The Supreme Court
of Nevada
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 67698
Short Caption:DAVIDSON VS. DAVIDSONClassification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D365382Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Disqualifications:Panel Assigned: En Banc
Replacement:
To SP/Judge:04/06/2015 / Segel, M.SP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:07/07/2016 at 10:00 AMOral Argument Location:Regional Justice Center
Submission Date:07/07/2016How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/01/2015Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Mills & Mills Law Group. Check no. 3504.
04/01/2015Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SEALED).
04/01/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed.15-09837
04/06/2015Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: M. Nelson Segel.15-10294
04/16/2015Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statment Civil Appeals.15-11475
05/21/2015Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: ECAR. Issued Notice to Settlement Judge M. Nelson Segel to file Early Case Assessment Report.15-15695
06/25/2015Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for June 29, 2015. at 10:00 a.m.15-19369
07/15/2015Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter.15-21467
07/17/2015Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant: 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix.15-21674
08/27/2015MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time to file Request for Transcript.15-26033
09/03/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion and Rejecting Transcript Request Form. Cause appearing, the untimely motion for an extension of time to file the transcript request form is granted. However, we are unable to file the submitted transcript request form because it does not bear the file-stamp of the district court clerk. The clerk shall reject the transcript request form received on September 1, 2015. Transcript Request Form due: 5 days.15-26770
09/08/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Attempt to File the Request for Transcript and Request for Submission of the Request for Transcript Form.15-27150
09/10/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant has no further obligation regarding the transcript request form in this appeal.15-27438
09/11/2015TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Sherry Justice stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 10/29/14, 12/15/14.15-27523
09/11/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Receipt of Copy (Transcripts 10/29/14, 12/15/14).15-27601
10/14/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant's Receipt of Copy of the transcript for the hearing of December 17, 2014.15-31277
10/16/2015BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.15-31460
10/16/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Receipt of Copy.15-31461
10/21/2015AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix.15-32029
10/21/2015TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Lawanda Brown stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 12/17/15.15-32062
10/21/2015TranscriptFiled Errata to the Notice from Court Reporter. Kim Gurule stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 12/17/14.15-32065
11/17/2015Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Answering Brief due: November 30, 2015.15-35034
12/01/2015MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time (Second) - Answering Brief.15-36495
12/10/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Answering Brief due: December 16, 2015.15-37775
12/17/2015BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.15-38515
01/12/2016BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.16-00891
01/12/2016Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
03/24/2016Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar.16-09273
05/24/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for Thursday, July 7, 2016, at 10:00 a.m. in Las Vegas for 30 minutes.16-16291
06/23/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.16-19709
07/07/2016Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court.
09/29/2016Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Cherry, J. Majority: Cherry/Parraguirre/Hardesty/Douglas/Gibbons/Pickering. Fn1[The Honorable Nancy M. Saitta, Justice, having retired, this matter was decided by a six-justice court.] 132 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 71. EN BANC16-30276
10/24/2016RemittiturIssued Remittitur.16-33163
10/24/2016Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/18/2016RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on October 31, 2016.16-33163