Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 67704
Short Caption:NASBY (BRENDAN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):35319, 47130, 58579, 67476, 67580, 68039, 70626, 70626-COA, 73412, 73412-COA, 80443, 80443-COA, 81484, 81484-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C154293Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Gibbons, SaittaCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/02/2015Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
04/02/2015Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.15-09949
04/21/2015OtherJustice Mark Gibbons disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Sat in District Court Proceedings.
04/21/2015OtherJustice Nancy M. Saitta disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Sat in District Court Proceedings.
04/27/2015Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." SNP15-RP/MD/MC15-12661
05/22/2015RemittiturIssued Remittitur.15-15742
05/22/2015Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/01/2015RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on May 27, 2015.15-15742