Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 67717
Short Caption:MAKI (CHARLES) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):30904, 63845, 66144, 67800, 69049, 78260, 78260-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR940345Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:05/08/2015How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/03/2015Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
04/03/2015Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.15-10063
04/22/2015Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. (Second NOA).15-12185
04/24/2015Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. (Third NOA).15-12525
05/04/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record. Record on Appeal due: 60 days.15-13551
05/08/2015Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volume 1.15-14236
05/08/2015Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volume 2.15-14238
05/08/2015Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volume 3.15-14240
05/08/2015Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volume 4.15-14241
05/08/2015Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volume 5.15-14242
05/08/2015Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volume 6.15-14243
05/08/2015Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volume 7.15-14247
05/08/2015Case Status UpdateSubmitted for Decision.
05/13/2015Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volume 8 (SEALED).
07/21/2015Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP15-NS/MG/KP.15-22087
08/17/2015RemittiturIssued Remittitur.15-24826
08/17/2015Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/26/2015RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on August 19, 2015.15-24826