Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Combined Case Information: 67741
Short Caption:GRIMES (BENNETT) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):62835, 67598, 74419, 74419-COA, 81042, 81042-COA, 81335, 81531, 81697, 81697-COA, 83088, 83088-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C276163Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/07/2015Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
04/07/2015Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.15-10512
05/18/2015Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." SNP15-RP/MD/MC15-15098
06/12/2015RemittiturIssued Remittitur.15-17943
06/12/2015Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/26/2015RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on June 18, 2015.15-17943