The Supreme Court
of Nevada
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 67756
Short Caption:NEWMAN (LINDSIE) VS. STATE C/W 67763Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Other
Consolidated:67756*, 67763
Lower Court Case(s):Carson City - First Judicial District - 13CR000501BCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Disqualifications:Panel Assigned: Panel
Replacement:
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:02/12/2016How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/08/2015Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
04/08/2015Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Filed certified copy of notice of appeal. (Fast Track Notice issued to counsel for appellant.)15-10629
04/08/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Request Rough Draft Transcripts. Due date: 10 days.15-10632
04/09/2015Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order. Filed in district court on: 4/1/15 Judgment of Revocation of Probation.15-10701
04/15/2015TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Michel Loomis stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 03/02/15, 03/23/15.15-11329
04/16/2015Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Copy Docket Entries Docket Sheet.15-11497
04/17/2015Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 3/23/15 To Court Reporter: Capitol Reporters.15-11601
04/24/2015MotionFiled Motion to Consolidate Fast Track Cases. Nos. 67756/67763.15-12470
04/24/2015MotionFiled Emergency Motion Under NRAP 27(E) Bail Pending Appeal.15-12600
04/30/2015MotionFiled Response to Emergency Motion Under NRAP 27(E) Bail Pending Appeal.15-13242
05/01/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Consolidating Appeals and Denying Motion for Bail. These appeals are consolidated for disposition only. The appeals shall retain their separate briefing schedules. Appellant has also filed a motion for admission to bail pending appeal. The motion is denied. Nos. 67756/67763.15-13352
05/06/2015Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Copy of District Court Docket Entries.15-13798
05/19/2015Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement.15-15289
05/19/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement.15-15290
06/05/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance, Jason D. Woodbury and Iris Yowell, Deputy District Attorneys, for the Respondent. Nos. 67756/67763.15-17164
06/08/2015Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. Nos. 67756/6776315-17349
06/22/2015Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Reply to Fast Track Reply due: June 29, 2015. Nos. 67756/67763.15-19005
06/30/2015MotionFiled Motion to Extend time in which to File Appellant's Reply Brief. Nos. 67756/67763.15-19878
07/08/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file the fast track reply received via E-Flex on July 7, 2015. Nos. 67756/67763.15-20761
07/09/2015Fast Track BriefFiled Reply to Fast Track Response. Nos. 67756/67763.15-20802
07/09/2015Case Status UpdateFast Track Briefing Completed. Nos. 67756/67763.
07/28/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Full Briefing. We have concluded that full briefing of these consolidated appeals is warranted. fn1[If a party's brief will cite to documents not previously filed in this court, that party must file and serve an appropriately documented supplemental appendix with the brief.] Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief. fn2[Neither party has objected to the sufficiency of the rough draft transcripts. Counsel need not file a certified transcript in this appeal as ordinarily required by NRAP 9. But should either counsel object to the sufficiency of the rough draft transcript or cite to transcripts not previously prepared, counsel shall file and serve a request for the necessary transcripts pursuant to NRAP 9(a).] Thereafter, briefing shall proceed as set forth in NRAP 31. Nos. 67756/67763.15-22791
08/25/2015Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Opening Brief due: September 10, 2015. Nos. 67756/6776315-25753
09/11/2015MotionFiled Motion to Enlarge Time in which to File Appellant's Opening Brief. Nos. 67756/67763.15-27548
09/15/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Opening Brief and Appendix due: September 30, 2015. Nos. 67756/67763.15-27940
10/01/2015BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. Nos. 67756/67763.15-29745
11/02/2015Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Answering Brief due: November 16, 2015. Nos. 67756/67763.15-33225
11/17/2015BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. Nos. 67756/67763.15-35009
12/18/2015BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. Nos. 67756/67763.15-38702
12/18/2015Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
02/12/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision without Oral Argument. Nos. 67756/6776316-04709
04/28/2016Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Dismissed (Docket No. 67756) and affirmed (Docket No. 67763). Before: Douglas/Cherry/Gibbons/ Author: Cherry, J. Majority: Cherry/Douglas/Gibbons. 132 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 31. NNP16D-MD/MC/MG Nos. 67756/6776316-13318
04/29/2016MotionFiled Motion to Redact Name and Reissue Opinion. Nos. 67756/6776316-13507
05/19/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Modifying Opinion. We direct the clerk of this court to modify the opinion filed on April 28, 2016, by replacing "Ms. Merideth" with "[Counsel]" and "MS. MERIDITH" with "[COUNSEL]" in the block quotation within the fourth paragraph following the heading "FACTS AND PROCEDURAL HISTORY." Nos. 67756/67763.16-15760
05/24/2016RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Nos. 67756/67763.16-16248
05/24/2016Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. Nos. 67756/67763.
05/26/2016Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Docket Entries. Nos. 67756/67763.16-16692
06/10/2016RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 26, 2016.16-16248
08/08/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter dated June 30, 2016 to Publishers with corrections to recently filed opinions. Nos. 66816/(59691/68304)/66888/65193/65388/(67756/67763)/68476/63178/62720/64281 (Letter entered in 66816 as document no. 16-24439.)