The Supreme Court
of Nevada
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 67772
Short Caption:GRIFFITH VS. GONZALES-ALPIZARClassification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Related Case(s):52446, 59387, 66954
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - DV0700606Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Disqualifications:Panel Assigned: En Banc
Replacement:
To SP/Judge:SP Status:Exempt
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:01/08/2016How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/09/2015Filing FeeFiling fee due for Appeal.
04/09/2015Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.15-10774
04/09/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days.15-10779
04/09/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Case Appeal Statement. Corrected case appeal statement due: 10 days.15-10781
04/14/2015MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal and Request for Sanctions.15-11162
04/15/2015Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Jeffrey Friedman. Check No. 8027.
04/15/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 20 days.15-11344
04/15/2015Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Exemption from Settlement Program. It has been determined that this appeal will not be assigned to the settlement program. Appellant(s) 15 days transcript request form; 120 days opening brief:15-11359
04/29/2015MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time to File Case Appeal Statement.15-13033
04/29/2015Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request.15-13035
04/30/2015MotionFiled Respondent's Response to Motion to Extend Time to File Case Appeal Statement.15-13173
05/04/2015MotionFiled Motion to Allow Late Filing of Opposition to Motion to Dismiss.15-13597
05/06/2015MotionFiled Motion to Strike "Motion to Dismiss" and "Response to Motion to Expand Time" and/or the Certificates of Service Attached Thereto.15-13868
05/07/2015MotionFiled Opposition to Motion to Strike "Motion to Dismiss" and "Response to Motion to Extend Time" and/or the Certificate of Service attached Thereto, and Request for Sanctions.15-14038
05/13/2015MotionFiled Motion to Forgive Late Filing of Docketing Statement.15-14686
05/14/2015MotionFiled Reply Regarding Motion to Strike Respondent's Motion to Dismiss and "Response to Motion to Expand Time" and/or the Certificates of Service Attached Thereto.15-14886
05/20/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motions. The clerk of this court shall file the docketing statement received on May 13, 2015, and the case appeal statement received on April 29, 2015.15-15413
05/20/2015Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.15-15417
05/20/2015Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement.15-15420
07/20/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion to Dismiss. Respondent's motion to dismiss this appeal is denied. Opening Brief and Appendix due: September 14, 2015. The briefing schedule in related appeal in Docket No. 66954 shall remain suspended pending further order of this court. fn1[Appellant's motion to allow late filing of the opposition to the motion to dismiss is granted. The clerk of this court shall file appellant's opposition to the motion to dismiss submitted on May 4, 2015, and respondent's reply received on May 7, 2015.] fn2[Appellant's motion to strike the motion to dismiss and respondent's motion for sanctions are denied.]15-21899
07/20/2015MotionFiled Opposition to Motion to Dismiss and Sanctions.15-21900
07/20/2015MotionFiled Reply to Opposition to Motion to Dismiss and Request for Sanctions.15-21901
08/12/2015BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.15-24385
08/12/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief.15-24386
08/19/2015BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.15-25161
08/19/2015AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix.15-25162
09/01/2015BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.15-26594
09/01/2015Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
09/08/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant's Erratum Re: Opening Brief.15-27035
09/08/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant's Erratum Re: Reply Brief.15-27037
11/02/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Supplemental Briefing and Inviting Participation by Amicus Curiae. Appellant's Supplemental Brief due: 15 days. Respondent's Response due: 15 days, thereafter. The Family Court Division of the State Bar of Nevada is invited to participate as amicus curiae. Should this organization elect to participate as amicus curiae, it shall file and serve an amicus brief within 30 days from the date of this order.15-33312
11/16/2015MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time to Comply with Court's Order of November 2, 2015 (Supplement Brief).15-34972
11/18/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until November 25, 2015, to file and serve the supplemental brief. Respondent shall have until December 10, 2015, to file and serve a response.15-35299
11/25/2015BriefFiled Appellant's Supplemental Brief.15-36096
11/30/2015BriefFiled Respondent's Supplemental Brief.15-36228
12/02/2015MotionFiled Notice of Acceptance of Invitation to File Amicus Curiae Brief and Request for Supplemental Briefing Schedule.15-36604
12/10/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Amicus Brief due: December 21, 2015.15-37753
12/22/2015BriefFiled Family Law Section of the State Bar of Nevada's Amicus Curiae Brief.15-39196
01/08/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision without Oral Argument.16-00584
01/11/2016Notice/IncomingFiled Certificate of Service (State Bar of Nevada's Amicus Curiae Brief).16-00841
05/26/2016Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before the Court EN BANC, Author: Parraguirre, C.J. Majority: Parraguirre/Hardesty/Douglas/Cherry/Saitta/Gibbons/Pickering. 132 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 3816-16625
06/21/2016RemittiturIssued Remittitur.16-19368
06/21/2016Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/01/2016RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on June 23, 2016.16-19368