The Supreme Court
of Nevada
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 67777
Short Caption:KELLEY (JUSTIN) VS. STATEClassification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Lower Court Case(s):Elko Co. - Fourth Judicial District - CR-FP-14-198Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Disqualifications:Panel Assigned: Panel
Replacement:
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:02/12/2016How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/10/2015Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
04/10/2015Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Filed certified copy of notice of appeal. (Fast Track Notice issued to counsel for appellant.)15-10859
05/05/2015TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Lisa A. Manley stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 12/18/14.15-13711
05/18/2015Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement.15-15149
05/18/2015AppendixFiled Fast Track Appendix.15-15150
06/08/2015Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response.15-17281
06/29/2015Case Status UpdateFast Track Briefing Completed. No Reply Filed.
02/12/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision without Oral Argument.16-04712
04/28/2016Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Reversed." Before: Douglas/Cherry/Gibbons. Author: Douglas, J. Majority: Douglas/Cherry/Gibbons. 132 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 32. NNP16D-MD/MC/MG16-13319
05/23/2016RemittiturIssued Remittitur.16-16063
05/23/2016Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/10/2016RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 26, 2016.16-16063