The Supreme Court
of Nevada
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 67786
Short Caption:JUSTIN VS. DIST. CT. (STATE)Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial DistrictCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Disqualifications:Panel Assigned: En Banc
Replacement:
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:02/12/2016How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/13/2015Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $250.00 from Richard F. Cornell.
04/13/2015Petition/WritFiled Original Petition for Writ of Mandamus.15-11008
04/13/2015Other Incoming DocumentFiled Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Petition for Writ of Mandamus.15-11032
04/13/2015AppendixFiled Exhibits to Petition for Writ of Mandamus.15-11035
04/17/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service.15-11700
05/20/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answers. Respondent and Real Party in Interest Answers due: 30 days. Petitioners shall have 15 days from service of the last-filed answer to file and serve any reply.15-15447
06/12/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance of Counsel, Robert L. Eisenberg for the Respondent, Janet J. Berry, District Judge.15-17979
06/15/2015Petition/WritFiled Respondent Judge Janet J. Berry's Answer to Petition for Writ of Mandamus.15-18230
06/15/2015AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix.15-18231
06/16/2015Petition/WritFiled State of Nevada's Answer to Petition for Writ of Mandamus.15-18270
06/22/2015Petition/WritFiled Reply to Answer of Respondent, Judge Janet Berry and Real Party in Interest, The State of Nevada.15-19061
02/12/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision without Oral Argument..16-04713
06/30/2016Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Petition denied." Before: Douglas/Cherry/Gibbons. Author: Douglas, J. Majority: Douglas/Cherry/Gibbons. 132 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 47. NNP16D-MD/MC/MG16-20460
07/15/2016Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for Rehearing.16-22167
07/18/2016Filing FeeRehearing Filing Fee Paid. $150.00 from Law Office of Richard F. Cornell. Check No. 16017.
07/22/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer to Petition for Rehearing. Real Party in Interest's Answer due: 15 days.16-22922
08/05/2016Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Answer to Petition for Rehearing.16-24274
08/24/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Issued Letter to Publishers regarding corrections to recently filed opinions. Nos. 58101/67835/67519/65598/67786/65364 (Document entered in case no. 58101 document no. 16-26404.)
09/22/2016Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c).16-29432
10/04/2016Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for En Banc Reconsideration.16-30768
10/05/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer to Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. Respondents and the Real Party In Interest's Answer due: 15 days.16-31059
10/17/2016Post-Judgment PetitionFiled The State of Nevada and Respondent's Answer to Petition for En Banc Reconsideration.16-32373
11/23/2016Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. Having considered the petition on file herein, we have concluded that en banc reconsideration is not warranted. NRAP 40A. Accordingly, we "ORDER the petition DENIED." EN BANC16-36506
12/19/2016RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu/Rehearing.16-39362
12/19/2016Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.