The Supreme Court
of Nevada
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 67830
Short Caption:MASON (QUINZALE) VS. STATEClassification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR141830Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Disqualifications:Panel Assigned: Panel
Replacement:
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/20/2015Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
04/20/2015Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Filed certified copy of notice of appeal. (Fast Track Notice issued to counsel for appellant.)15-11814
04/21/2015TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. C. Eisenberg stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 1/27/15.15-12144
05/14/2015TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Misty Leslie stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 02/06/15, 02/09/15, 02/10/15, 02/11/15, 02/12/15.15-14883
05/29/2015Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast track statement and appendix due: June 8, 2015.15-16457
06/05/2015MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time to file Appellant's Fast Track Statement and Joint Appendix.15-17163
06/10/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: July 8, 2015.15-17669
06/18/2015TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter Misty Leslie stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 3/17/15.15-18717
07/06/2015Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement.15-20472
07/06/2015AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume One.15-20473
07/06/2015AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume Two.15-20474
07/06/2015AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume Three.15-20475
07/06/2015AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume Four.15-20476
07/28/2015Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response.15-22745
07/30/2015Fast Track BriefFiled Reply to Fast Track Response.15-23042
07/30/2015Case Status UpdateFast Track Briefing Completed.
06/16/2016Opinion/DispositionalFiled Per Curiam Opinion. "Affirmed and remanded with instructions." Before: Hardesty/Saitta/Pickering. Majority: Hardesty/Saitta/Pickering. 132 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 42. SNP16/JH/NS/KP16-18837
07/11/2016RemittiturIssued Remittitur.16-21383
07/11/2016Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/19/2016RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on July 13, 2016.16-21383