The Supreme Court
of Nevada
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 67835
Short Caption:BADGER VS. DIST. CT. (OMNI FAMILY LTD. P'SHIP.)Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus/Prohibition
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A680542Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Disqualifications:Panel Assigned: En Banc
Replacement:
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:12/28/2015How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/21/2015Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $250.00 from Charles M. Vlasic, III.
04/21/2015Petition/WritFiled Petition For Writ Of Mandamus, Or Alternatively, For Writ Of Prohibition.15-12019
04/21/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ.15-12026
05/01/2015MotionFiled Motion To Exceed Page Limit Of Motion To Stay.15-13331
05/06/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. We grant the motion and direct the clerk of this court to file the motion for stay provisionally received on May 1, 2015. Real party in interest shall have seven days from the date of this order to file a response. Petitioner shall have five days from the date of the response to file any reply.15-13881
05/06/2015MotionFiled Motion To Stay District Court Proceedings.15-13883
05/13/2015MotionFiled Opposition to Motion to Stay District Court Proceedings.15-14736
05/21/2015MotionFiled Reply In Support of Motion to Stay District Court Proceedings.15-15618
05/21/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Answer Writ Petition. Real Party in Interest's Answer due: 30 days. Petitioners shall have 15 days from service of the answer to file and serve any reply. fn1[We defer ruling on petitioners' pending stay motion at this time.]15-15714
05/21/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Substitution of Counsel. Counsel for petitioners, I Scott Bogatz and Charles M. Vlasic, III, are now with the firm Reid Rubinstein & Bogatz.15-15715
06/22/2015MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Briefing Schedule.15-19059
06/25/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Approving Stipulation. Real Party in Interest's Answer due: June 29, 2015.15-19374
06/26/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Stay in Part. We therefore stay all further proceedings in Eighth Judicial District Court Case No. A-1680542, with respect to petitioners pending further order of this court. Proceedings against other parties below may continue.15-19581
06/30/2015Petition/WritFiled Response to Petition for Writ of Mandamus, or Alternatively, Writ of Prohibition.15-19897
07/09/2015MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Deadline to File Reply in Support of Writ.15-20890
07/14/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Petitioner's reply in support of the writ petition due: August 7, 2015.15-21418
08/10/2015Petition/WritFiled Reply to Answer to Petition to for Writ.15-23976
09/08/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance (Daniel Polsenberg and Joel Henriod as Counsel for the Real Party in Interest Omni Family Limited Partnership).15-27095
12/28/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision without Oral Argument.15-39679
03/04/2016Notice/IncomingFiled Petitioner John A. Ritter's Suggestion of Bankruptcy and Notice of Operation of Automatic Stay.16-07104
03/18/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order. We dismiss this petition as to John A. Ritter only. This dismissal is without prejudice to Ritter's right to move for reinstatement of his petition upon either the lifting of the bankruptcy stay or final resolution of the bankruptcy proceedings, if Ritter deems such a motion appropriate at that time.16-08698
05/26/2016Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Petition Granted." Before the Court EN BANC. Author: Gibbons, J. Majority: Parraguirre/Douglas/Cherry/Saitta/Gibbons. Pickering, J. with whom Hardesty, J. agrees, dissenting. 132 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 39.16-16627
05/26/2016WritIssued Writ with letter. Original and one copy of writ and copy of Opinion mailed to Charles M. Vlasic, lll for service upon Judge Jerry A. Wiese.16-16651
06/01/2016Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Firm Address. (Reid Rubinstein Bogatz)16-17119
06/21/2016RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur.16-19356
06/21/2016Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/22/2016Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service (Original Writ served on Judge Jerry Wiese on August 18, 2016).16-25911
08/24/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Issued Letter to Publishers regarding corrections to recently filed opinions. Nos. 58101/67835/67519/65598/67786/65364 (Document entered in case no. 58101 document no. 16-26404.)