The Supreme Court
of Nevada
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 67927
Short Caption:GOLIGHTLY & VANNAH, PLLC VS. TJ ALLEN, LLCClassification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Related Case(s):67724
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV1400582Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Disqualifications:Panel Assigned: Panel
Replacement:
To SP/Judge:SP Status:Exempt
Oral Argument:03/18/2016 at 10:00 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:03/18/2016How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/05/2015Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Golightly & Vannah. Check no. 2208.
05/05/2015Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)15-13702
05/05/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed.15-13708
05/08/2015Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Exemption from Settlement Program. It has been determined that this appeal will not be assigned to the settlement program. Appellant(s) 15 days transcript request form; 120 days opening brief:15-14104
05/20/2015Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request.15-15443
05/20/2015Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.15-15555
09/04/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief.15-26882
09/08/2015BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.15-26989
09/24/2015MotionFiled Respondent's Motion for Extension to File the Answering Brief.15-28938
09/30/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent Renown Regional Medical Center's Answering Brief due: November 12, 2015. Respondent TJ Allen, LLC's notice of appearance of counsel due: 11 days.15-29614
11/12/2015BriefFiled Respondent's (Renown Regional Medical Center) Answering Brief.15-34525
11/12/2015AppendixFiled Respondent's (Renown Regional Medical Center) Appendix.15-34526
11/16/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order. This appeal will be decided without an answering brief from respondent TJ Allen, LLC.15-34846
12/14/2015BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.15-37951
12/14/2015Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
02/22/2016Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar.16-05644
02/25/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Wednesday, March 16, 2016, at 1:30 p.m. for 30 minutes in Carson City.16-06115
02/26/2016MotionFiled Respondent's Motion for Postponement of Oral Argument.16-06291
03/01/2016MotionFiled Appellant's Opposition To Respondent's Motion For Postponement Of Oral Argument.16-06509
03/02/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. This matter is currently scheduled for oral argument on March 16, 2016, at 1:30 p.m. On February 26, 2016, respondent Renown Regional Medical Center filed a motion to continue oral argument. The motion is granted. This matter will be continued to Friday, March 18, 2016, at 10:00 a.m.16-06754
03/02/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.16-06798
03/18/2016Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. To the Northern Nevada Panel. NNP16D-MD/MC/MG.
06/02/2016Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before: Douglas/Cherry/Gibbons. Author: Cherry, J. Majority: Cherry/Douglas/Gibbons.132 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 41. NNP16D-MD/MC/MG16-17123
06/09/2016Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Association of Counsel (Robert Eglet and Erica Entsminger as counsel for the Appellant).16-18089
06/21/2016Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for Rehearing.16-19309
06/21/2016Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from Robert T. Eglet
09/22/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer to Petition for Rehearing. Respondents Answer due: 15 days.16-29510
10/04/2016Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Respondent's Answer to Petition for Rehearing.16-30857
10/27/2016Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c).16-33754
11/21/2016RemittiturIssued Remittitur.16-36223
11/21/2016Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/29/2016RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on November 22, 2016.16-36223