The Supreme Court
of Nevada
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 68029
Short Caption:IN RE: FREI IRREVOCABLE TRUSTClassification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - P065257Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Disqualifications:Panel Assigned: En Banc
Replacement:
To SP/Judge:05/28/2015 / Shirinian, AraSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:10/05/2016 at 10:00 AMOral Argument Location:Regional Justice Center
Submission Date:10/05/2016How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/19/2015Filing FeeFiling fee due for Appeal.
05/19/2015Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.15-15356
05/19/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days.15-15358
05/26/2015Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Documents from District Court Clerk. Confidential Civil Cover Sheet (SEALED).
05/26/2015Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Law Office of Mike Beede PLLC. Check No. 1264.
05/27/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 20 days.15-16085
05/28/2015Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Ara H. Shirinian.15-16271
06/03/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance, Michael K. Wall of Hutchison & Steffen, LLC, for Respondents, Lawrence Howe and Elizabeth Mary Frei.15-16916
06/15/2015Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for August 6, 2015 at 9:30 a.m.15-18197
06/19/2015MotionFiled Motion to Accept Late Filing of Docketing Statement.15-18896
06/23/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Due date: 10 days. (Motion to Accept Late Filing of Docketing Statement).15-19110
06/25/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service - Acceptance of Service: Motion to Accept Late Filing of Docketing Statement: Russel J. Geist.15-19389
06/25/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service - Affidavit of Service: Motion to Accept Late Filing of Docketing Statement: Ara Shirinian.15-19390
06/25/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service - Acceptance of Service: Motion to Accept Late Filing of Docketing Statement: Richard D. Chatwin.15-19394
06/29/2015Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion for extension of time to file docketing statement. The docketing statement received on June 19, 2015, shall be filed.15-19747
06/29/2015Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.15-19749
08/24/2015Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter.15-25623
08/25/2015Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order Reinstating Briefing. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Accordingly, we reinstate the deadlines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs. Appellant(s): 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix.15-25811
10/16/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order To Comply With NRAP 9. On August 25, 2015, this court entered an order exempting this appeal from the settlement program. That order, among other things, directed appellants to file a transcript request form within 15 days. To date, appellants have failed to comply with this court's order. Transcript Request Form due: 11 days. fn1[If no transcript is to be requested, appellants shall file and serve a certificate to that effect within the same time period.]15-31576
10/28/2015Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request.15-32824
11/19/2015MotionFiled Joint Stipulation to Extend The Deadline to File Appellant's Opening Brief for 30 Days (First Request).15-35377
11/19/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Opening Brief and Appendix due: December 23, 2015.15-35381
12/23/2015BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.15-39409
12/23/2015AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix of Exhibits Volume I.15-39474
12/23/2015AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix of Exhibits Volume II.15-39475
12/23/2015AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix of Exhibits Volume III.15-39478
12/23/2015AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix of Exhibits Volume IV.15-39479
01/19/2016MotionFiled Joint Stipulation to Extend Briefing Schedule (First Request).16-01668
01/19/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Respondents' Answering Briefs due: February 22, 2016.16-01672
02/22/2016BriefFiled Respondents Lawrence Howe and Elizabeth Mary Frei's Answering Brief.16-05620
02/23/2016BriefFiled Respondent Premier Trust, Inc.'s Ansering Brief.
02/23/2016AppendixFiled Appendix to Respondent Premier Trust, Inc.'s Ansering Brief.16-05716
02/23/2016Notice/IncomingFiled Errata to Respondent Premier Trust, Inc.'s Appendix.16-05728
02/24/2016BriefFiled Respondent Premier Trust, Inc.'s Amended Answering Brief. (Amended)16-05907
03/21/2016MotionFiled Joint Stipulation to Extend the Deadline to File Appellant's Reply Brief for 14 Days (First Request).16-08812
03/21/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice - Stipulation Approved. Reply Brief due: April 7, 2016.16-08816
04/11/2016BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.16-11106
04/11/2016Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
07/29/2016Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar.16-23722
09/14/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled on Wednesday, October 5, 2016, at 10:00 a.m. for 30 minutes in Las Vegas.16-28485
09/26/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.16-29889
10/05/2016Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court.
03/02/2017Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Fn1[The Honorable Lidia S. Stiglich, Justice, did not participate in the decision of this matter.] Before the Court En Banc. Author: Cherry, C.J. Majority: Cherry/Douglas/Gibbons/Pickering/Hardesty/Parraguirre. 133 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 8. EN BANC17-07093
03/27/2017RemittiturIssued Remittitur.17-10061
03/27/2017Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.