The Supreme Court
of Nevada
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 68030
Short Caption:PERRY VS. TERRIBLE HERBST, INC.Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Related Case(s):67723
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A704428Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Disqualifications:Panel Assigned: En Banc
Replacement:
To SP/Judge:SP Status:Exempt
Oral Argument:06/07/2016 at 2:30 PMOral Argument Location:Regional Justice Center
Submission Date:06/07/2016How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/19/2015Filing FeeFiling fee due for Appeal. Filing fee will be forwarded by the District Court.
05/19/2015Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)15-15365
05/19/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed.15-15368
05/20/2015Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Exemption from Settlement Program. It has been determined that this appeal will not be assigned to the settlement program. Appellant(s) 15 days transcript request form; 120 days opening brief:15-15506
05/22/2015Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Wolf, Rifkin, Shapiro, Schulman & Rabkin, LLP. Check No. 4310.
06/04/2015Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 12/16/14 To Court Reporter: Carrie Hansen.15-17065
06/22/2015MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time to File Docketing Statement.15-18974
06/24/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file the docketing statement received on June 22, 2015.15-19215
06/24/2015Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement - Civil Appeals.15-19218
07/13/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order to Show Cause. Appellant's Response due: 30 days. Respondent may file any reply within ten days from the date that appellants' response is served. Briefing is suspended.15-21098
07/29/2015MotionFiled Appellant's Response to Order to Show Cause.15-22883
08/07/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Reinstating Briefing. Opening Brief and Appendix due: 90 days. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed pursuant to NRAP 31(a)(1).15-23904
08/11/2015TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Carrie Hansen stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 12/16/14.15-24187
11/04/2015BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.15-33646
11/04/2015AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume I.15-33649
11/04/2015AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume II.15-33652
12/03/2015Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Answering Brief due: December 18, 2015.15-36894
12/18/2015BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.15-38805
01/19/2016BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.16-01740
01/19/2016Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
04/27/2016Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar.16-13245
05/04/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Tuesday, June 7, 2016, at 2:30 p.m. for 30 minutes in Las Vegas.16-13993
05/20/2016Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance at Oral Argument (Bradley Schrager to argue on behalf of the Appellant).16-15895
05/23/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.16-16123
05/31/2016Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance at Oral Argument (Rick D. Roskelley and Montgomery Paek to argue on behalf of Respondent).16-16987
06/07/2016Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court.
10/27/2016Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Fn1[The Honorable Nancy M. Saitta, Justice, having retired, this matter was decided by a six-justice court.] Before the Court En Banc. Author: Pickering, J. Majority: Pickering/Parraguirre/Hardesty/Douglas/Cherry/Gibbons. 132 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 75. EN BANC16-33622
11/21/2016RemittiturIssued Remittitur.16-36229
11/21/2016Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/09/2016RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on November 29, 2016.16-36229