The Supreme Court
of Nevada
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 68033
Short Caption:ESTATE OF MICHAEL DAVID ADAMS VS. FALLINIClassification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Related Case(s):56840, 66521
Lower Court Case(s):Nye Co. - Fifth Judicial District - CV24539Case Status:En Banc Reconsider Denied
Disqualifications:Panel Assigned: En Banc
Replacement:
To SP/Judge:SP Status:Exempt
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:09/30/2016How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/20/2015Filing FeeFiling fee due for Appeal. Filing fee will be forwarded by the District Court.
05/20/2015Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)15-15457
05/20/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed.15-15459
05/20/2015Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Exemption from Settlement Program. It has been determined that this appeal will not be assigned to the settlement program. Appellant(s) 15 days transcript request form; 120 days opening brief:15-15516
05/29/2015Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Bank of America Cashier's Check No. 1085403253
06/04/2015Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: April 13, 2015. To Court Reporter: Patricia Carl.15-17096
06/10/2015Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.15-17619
06/18/2015Docketing StatementFiled Response to Appellant's Docketing Statement.15-18748
06/25/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order to Show Cause. Appellant's Response due: 30 days. Briefing is suspended. fn1[Respondent also seeks sanctions and dismissal of this appeal on the grounds that the docketing statement is inaccurate and contravenes this court's order in Estate of M. Adams v. District Court, Docket No. 66521 (Order Denying Petition, January 15, 2015). We decline to sanction appellant or to dismiss the appeal.]15-19380
07/24/2015Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Response to the order to show cause due: August 10, 2015.15-22549
08/10/2015MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause.15-24115
08/13/2015MotionFiled Request for Leave to Reply to Appellant's Response to Order to Show Cause.15-24478
08/20/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent shall have until August 24, 2015, to file a reply to appellants' response of no more than five pages.15-25207
08/24/2015MotionFiled Respondent's Reply to Appellant's Response to Order to Show Cause.15-25572
12/02/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Reinstating Briefing. Court Reporter Patricia Carl's Certificate of Delivery of Transcripts due: 15 days. Opening Brief and Appendix due: 60 days.15-36766
01/21/2016MotionFiled Motion For Acceptance and Review of Video Exhibit.16-02184
02/01/2016MotionFiled Response to Appellant's Motion for Acceptance and Reviewof Video Exhibit.16-03275
02/01/2016Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Opening Brief and Appendix due: February 16, 2016.16-03370
02/02/2016TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Patricia Carl stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 04/13/15.16-03455
02/04/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Appellants have filed a "Motion for Acceptance and Review of Video Exhibit." The motion does not comply with NRAP 10(b)(2) ("If exhibits cannot be copied to be included in the appendix, the parties may request transmittal of the original exhibits to the Supreme Court under Rule 30(d)). Accordingly, we deny the motion without prejudice to appellants' right to file a motion that complies with NRAP 10.16-03762
02/09/2016MotionFiled Motion to Transmit Video Exhibit.16-04177
02/11/2016BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.16-04496
02/11/2016AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Volume I.16-04497
02/11/2016AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Volume II.16-04498
02/11/2016AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Volume III.16-04499
02/11/2016AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Volume IV.16-04500
02/11/2016AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Volume V.16-04501
02/11/2016AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Volume VI.16-04502
02/11/2016AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Volume VII.16-04503
02/19/2016MotionFiled Response to Appellant's Motion to Transmit Video Exhibit.16-05409
02/23/2016MotionFiled Reply to Respondent's Response to Appellant's Motion to Transmit Video Exhibit.16-05809
03/09/2016MotionFiled Joint Stipulation to Extend Respondent's Time to File Answering Brief.16-07482
03/09/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Answering Brief due: April 13, 2016.16-07490
03/09/2016Notice/IncomingFiled Certificate of Service of Joint Stipulation to Extend Respondent's Time to File Answering Brief.16-07555
03/18/2016MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Appellate Jurisdiction.16-08619
03/22/2016MotionFiled Respondent's Motion to Stay Briefing Schedule.16-09072
03/25/2016MotionFiled Appellant's Response to Defendant's/Respondent's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Appellate Jurisdiction.16-09478
03/25/2016MotionFiled Appellant's Response To Respondent's Motion to Stay Briefing Schedule.16-09495
03/31/2016MotionFiled Reply to Appellant's Response to Motion to Stay Briefing Schedule.16-10153
03/31/2016MotionFiled Reply to Appellant's Response to Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Appellate Jurisdiction.16-10169
05/04/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Transmission of Video Proceedings and Denying Motion to Dismiss Appeal. District Court Video Recording of July 28, 2014, due: 30 days. The clerk of this court shall file the respondent's answering brief received on April 14, 2016. fn1[We deny as moot respondent's motion for a stay of the briefing schedule.]16-14007
05/04/2016BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.16-14008
05/12/2016BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.16-14938
05/12/2016Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
09/30/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting For Decision Without Oral Argument.16-30456
12/29/2016Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before Parraguirre, C.J., Hardesty and Pickering, JJ. Author: Parraguirre, C.J. 132 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 81.16-40388
01/11/2017Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Petition for Rehearing due: January 31, 2017.17-00944
01/31/2017Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant's Petition for Rehearing.17-03478
01/31/2017Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from John P. Aldrich
02/15/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter to Publishers regarding corrections on recently filed opinions. Nos. 68987/(61715/65819/66452)/66094/68434/(69611/70648)/(68523/68754/68770/68845)/(68949/68975)/69065/68033/69218 (Filed in Docket no. 68989, Document no. 17-05409)
03/21/2017Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c).17-09269
04/03/2017MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time to File Appellant's Petition for En Banc Reconsideration.17-10908
04/10/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Petition for En Banc Reconsideration due: May 4, 2017.17-11815
05/03/2017Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for En Banc Reconsideration.17-14772
06/27/2017Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. Having considered the petition on file herein, we have concluded that en banc reconsideration is not warranted. NRAP 40A. Accordingly, we "ORDER the petition DENIED." EN BANC17-21277