Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 68046
Short Caption:IN RE: CONNELL LIVING TRUST C/W 66231/67782Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:66231*, 67782, 68046Related Case(s):66231, 67782, 69737, 71577, 72766, 72897, 73837, 74517, 75107, 75593
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - P066425Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:Exempt
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:05/02/2016How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/21/2015Filing FeeFiling fee due for Appeal. Filing fee will be forwarded by the District Court.
05/21/2015Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)15-15687
05/21/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed.15-15689
05/22/2015Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Exemption from Settlement Program. It has been determined that this appeal will not be assigned to the settlement program. Appellant(s) 15 days transcript request form; 120 days opening brief:15-15762
05/26/2015Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck. Check No. 246661.
05/27/2015Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Documents from District Court Clerk. Confidential Civil Cover Sheet (SEALED).
06/09/2015Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 01/14/15, 04/22/15, 05/13/15 (Esparza), 12/19/14, 02/18/15 (Haak). To Court Reporter: Kerry Esparza and Francesca Haak.15-17455
06/09/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Amended Certificate of Service (Transcript request).15-17612
06/11/2015Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.15-17771
07/01/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance (Michael Wall as Counsel for Fredrick P. Waid, Court Appointed Trustee).15-20147
07/31/2015Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental.15-23275
08/03/2015Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Confidential Civil Cover Sheet (SEALED).
08/07/2015MotionFiled Motion to Consolidate Related Appeals.15-23859
08/14/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order. As Frederick P. Waid is not a party to this appeal, to the extent that Mr. Wall seeks to be added as counsel of record in this appeal, we decline to do so. However, the clerk of this court shall add attorney Michael K. Wall for notice only on the docket of this appeal.15-24665
08/17/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance, Joseph J. Powell of The Rushforth Firm, Ltd., for the Respondents, Jacqueline M. Montoya and Kathryn A. Bouvier15-24848
08/26/2015MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time (Opening Brief and Appendix).15-25922
08/26/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Opening Brief and Appendix due: October 21, 2015.15-25928
08/31/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. We hereby consolidate these appeals. Appellant shall file a single opening brief and appendix on or before October 21, 2015. The clerk of this court shall add attorney Michael K. Wall for notice only on the docket of these consolidated appeals. Nos. 66231/67782/68046.15-26344
10/19/2015MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time. (Opening Brief) Nos.66231/67782/68046.15-31705
10/23/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Opening Brief and Appendix due: November 20, 2015. Nos. 66231/67782/68046.15-32420
11/20/2015BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. Nos. 66231/67782/68046.15-35643
11/20/2015AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 1 of 17. Nos. 66231/67782/68046.15-35644
11/20/2015AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 2 of 17. Nos. 66231/67782/68046.15-35645
11/20/2015AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 3 of 17. Nos. 66231/67782/68046.15-35646
11/20/2015AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 4 of 17. Nos. 66231/67782/68046.15-35647
11/20/2015AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 5 of 17. Nos. 66231/67782/68046.15-35650
11/20/2015AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 6 of 17. Nos. 66231/67782/68046.15-35651
11/20/2015AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 7 of 17. Nos. 66231/67782/68046.15-35652
11/20/2015AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 8 of 17. Nos. 66231/67782/68046.15-35653
11/20/2015AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 9 of 17. Nos. 66231/67782/68046.15-35654
11/20/2015AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 10 of 17. Nos. 66231/67782/68046.15-35655
11/20/2015AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 11 of 17. Nos. 66231/67782/68046.15-35656
11/20/2015AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 12 of 17. Nos. 66231/67782/68046.15-35657
11/20/2015AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 13 of 17. Nos. 66231/67782/68046.15-35658
11/20/2015AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 14 of 17. Nos. 66231/67782/68046.15-35659
11/20/2015AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 15 of 17. Nos. 66231/67782/68046.15-35660
11/20/2015AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 16 of 17. Nos. 66231/67782/68046.15-35661
11/20/2015AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 17 of 17. Nos. 66231/67782/68046.15-35662
11/25/2015MotionFiled Motion to File Portions of Appendix Under Seal. Nos. 66231/67782/68046.15-36164
12/04/2015MotionFiled Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief.15-37023
12/21/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion and Approving Stipulation. The clerk of this court shall file the portions of the appendix received on November 25, 2015, under seal. Answering Brief due: January 20, 2016. Nos. 66231/67782/68046.15-39035
12/21/2015AppendixFiled Portions of Appellant's Appendix Volume 13 (SEALED). Nos. 66231/67782/68046. (FILED UNDER SEAL PER ORDER 12/21/15).
12/21/2015AppendixFiled Portions of Appellant's Appendix Volume 14 (SEALED). Nos. 66231/67782/68046. (FILED UNDER SEAL PER ORDER 12/21/15).
12/21/2015AppendixFiled Portions of Appellant's Appendix Volume 15 (SEALED). Nos. 66231/67782/68046. (FILED UNDER SEAL PER ORDER 12/21/15).
01/07/2016MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time (Answering Brief). Nos. 66231/67782/68046.16-00545
01/12/2016TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Kerry Esparza stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 01/14/15, 10/14/15. Nos. 66231/67782/68046.16-00924
01/27/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Answering Brief due: February 19, 2016. Nos. 66231/67782/68046.16-02798
02/19/2016BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. Nos. 66231/67782/68046.16-05446
02/19/2016AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix. Nos. 66231/67782/68046.16-05447
03/17/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Frederick Brown, a nonparty to these consolidated appeals, has submitted a request that this court take judicial notice of certain documents. Mr. Brown has neither sought nor been granted leave to file documents as an amicus curiae. Accordingly, we direct the clerk of this court to return, unfiled, the document received on February 18, 2016. Nos. 66231/67782/68046.16-08467
03/21/2016MotionFiled Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief. Nos. 66231/67782/68046.16-08878
03/29/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Approving Stipulation. Reply Brief due: April 4, 2016. Nos. 66231/67782/68046.16-09772
04/05/2016BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.16-10610
04/05/2016Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
05/02/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. Nos. 66231/67782/68046.16-13593
08/10/2016MotionFiled Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. Nos. 66231/67782/68046.16-24756
08/24/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Counsel for appellant, Tamara Beatty Peterson, has filed a motion to withdraw as counsel of record. Cause appearing, the motion is granted. The clerk of this court shall remove Tamara Beatty Peterson as counsel of record for appellant. Appellant shall continue to be represented by Kirk B. Lenhard and Benjamin K. Reitz of Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, LLP. Nos. 66231/67782/68046.16-26343
01/26/2017Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal (Docket No. 66231) And Order of Affirmance (Docket Nos. 67782 and 68046). "ORDER the judgments of the district court in Docket Nos. 67782 and 68046 AFFIRMED and the appeal in Docket No. 66231 DISMISSED." Nos. 66231/67782/68046. SNP17-MD/MG/KP.17-02927
02/13/2017MotionFiled Respondent Jacqueline M. Montoyas' Motion to Reissue Order as Published Opinion Pursuant to NRAP 36(F). Nos. 66231/67782/68046.17-04902
05/04/2017Opinion/DispositionalFiled Per Curiam Opinion. "Affirmed in part and dismissed in part." Fn1[We grant respondent Montoya's motion to reissue the order as an opinion, and issue this opinion in place of our prior order.] Before: Douglas/Gibbons/Pickering. Majority: Douglas/Gibbons/Pickering. 133 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 19. SNP17-MD/MG/KP Nos. 66231/67782/6804617-14811
06/01/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Filing Fee on Rehearing. Due date: 10 days.17-18276
09/29/2017OtherReturned Unfiled Document "Petition for Rehearing." Nos. 66231/67782/68046.17-33264
10/24/2017RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Nos. 68046/66231/6778217-36559
10/24/2017Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. Nos. 68046/66231/67782
11/13/2017RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on October 31, 2017.17-36559