The Supreme Court
of Nevada
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 68239
Short Caption:RENTERIA-NOVOA (GUILLERMO) VS. STATEClassification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Related Case(s):60909, 61865
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C268285Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Disqualifications:Panel Assigned: Panel
Replacement:
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:09/24/2015How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/17/2015Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
06/17/2015Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.15-18502
09/08/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Transmission of Record. Record due: 60 days.15-27017
09/24/2015Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volume 1.15-28960
09/24/2015Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volumes 2-8. Via FTP.15-28926
09/24/2015Case Status UpdateSubmitted for Decision.
09/29/2015Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal-SEALED pages 365-381 (PSI) and pages 1505-1510.
12/16/2015MotionFiled Proper Person Motion for Appointment of Counsel Pursuant to NRS 34.750.15-38427
03/17/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Proper Person Notice of Change of Address (Guillermo Renteria-Novoa).17-08980
03/30/2017Opinion/DispositionalFiled Per Curiam Opinion. "Reversed and Remanded." Before Pickering, Hardesty, and Parraguirre, JJ. 133 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 11. SNP16P17-10574
04/24/2017RemittiturIssued Remittitur.17-13462
04/24/2017Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
05/05/2017RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on April 28, 2017.17-13462