Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 68310
Short Caption:OKADA VS. DIST. C T. (WYNN RESORTS, LTD.)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):61966, 68439, 70050, 70452, 71432, 71638, 73641, 73641-COA, 73949, 74063, 74184, 74326, 74500, 74519, 74582, 74591, 75852
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A656710Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus/Prohibition
Disqualifications:Parraguirre, PickeringCase Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:District Judge Wilson for Justice Parraguirre<br/>District Judge Dobrescu for Chief Justice PickeringPanel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:09/01/2015 at 11:30 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:09/01/2015How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/29/2015Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $250.00 from J. Stephen Peek.
06/29/2015Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition.15-19660
06/29/2015MotionFiled Petitioner Kazuo Okada's Motion to File Under Seal Volume III of Appendix to His Petition for Writ of Prohibition or Mandamus.15-19668
06/29/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Kazuo Okada's Petition for Writ of Prohibition or Mandamus Vol I of III (APP0001-0225).15-19670
06/29/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Kazuo Okada's Petition for Writ of Prohibition or Mandamus Vol II of III (APP0226-0374).15-19671
07/01/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Staying Deposition and Directing Answer. Real Party in Interest's Answer due: 20 days. Petitioner's Reply (if any) due: 11 days from service of answer. We further stay the deposition of petitioner pending our resolution of this petition. fn1[This stay is only as to the deposition of petitioner and does not affect any other proceedings in the case.]15-20107
07/07/2015Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is hereby scheduled before the en banc court on September 1, 2015, at the hour of 11:30 a.m., in Carson City. The argument shall be limited to 30 minutes.15-20597
07/10/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion to Seal. The clerk of this court shall file Volume III of the appendix, received on June 30, 2015, under seal.15-21026
07/10/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Kazuo Okada's Petition for Writ of Prohibition or Mandamus Vol. III of III. (Under Seal). (FILED UNDER SEAL PER ORDER 7/10/15).
07/21/2015MotionFiled Stipulation to Permit Elaine Wynn to File an Answering Brief as a Real Party in Interest.15-22004
07/22/2015Petition/WritFiled Wynn Resort's Answer to Petition for Writ of Prohibition or Mandamus.15-22127
07/22/2015AppendixFiled Supplemental Appendix in Support of Real Party in Interest Wynn Resorts, Limited's Answer to Petition for Writ of Prohibition or Mandamus Volume I.15-22128
07/22/2015AppendixFiled Supplemental Appendix in Support of Real Party in Interest Wynn Resorts, Limited's Answer to Petition for Writ of Prohibition or Mandamus Volume II.15-22129
07/22/2015AppendixFiled Supplemental Appendix in Support of Real Party in Interest Wynn Resorts, Limited's Answer to Petition for Writ of Prohibition or Mandamus Volume III.15-22131
07/22/2015AppendixFiled Supplemental Appendix in Support of Real Party in Interest Wynn Resorts, Limited's Answer to Petition for Writ of Prohibition or Mandamus Volume IV.15-22132
07/22/2015AppendixFiled Supplemental Appendix in Support of Real Party in Interest Wynn Resorts, Limited's Answer to Petition for Writ of Prohibition or Mandamus Volume V.15-22133
07/22/2015MotionFiled Wynn Resorts, Limited's Motion to File Volume VI of its Supplemental Appendix Under Seal.15-22134
07/22/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance (J. Colby Williams as counsel for Stephen Wynn).15-22246
07/27/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The clerk of this court shall add Elaine Wynn and Stephen Wynn as real parties in interest in this matter and amend the caption to conform to the caption in this order. The clerk shall file Elaine Wynn's answer to writ petition, supplemental appendix, and Stephen Wynn's joinder to that answer received on July 21 and 22, 2015. Wynn Resorts, Ltd. shall submit volume VI of its supplemental appendix for filing immediately; upon receipt, the clerk of this court shall file this volume under seal.15-22640
07/27/2015Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Writ - Answering Brief of Elaine P. Wynn to Kazuo Okada's Petition for Writ of Prohibition or Mandamus.15-22641
07/27/2015AppendixFiled Supplemental Appendix to Answering Brief of Elaine P. Wynn to Kazuo Okada's Petition for Writ of Prohibition or Mandamus Vol. I.15-22642
07/27/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Real Party in Interest Stephen A. Wynn's Joinder in Answer to Petition for Writ of Prohibition or Mandamus.15-22643
07/27/2015AppendixFiled Supplemental Appendix in Support of Real Party in Interest Wynn Resorts, Limited's Answer to Petition for Writ of Prohibition or Mandamus Volume VI (SEALED).
07/28/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Notice Of Suggestion Of Recusal.15-22752
07/30/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Tuesday, September 1, 2015, at 11:30 a.m. for 30 minutes in Carson City.15-23084
08/04/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Petitioner Kazuo Okada's Objection to Wynn Resorts, Limited's Notice of Suggestion of Recusal.15-23435
08/04/2015Petition/WritFiled Kazuo Okada's Reply In Support of Petition for Writ of Prohibition or Mandamus.15-23438
08/04/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Kazuo Okada's Reply in Support of Petition For Writ of Prohibition or Mandamus.15-23439
08/06/2015MotionFiled Response to Objection to Suggestion of Recusal (Reply to Response).15-23678
08/14/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Voluntary Recusal. Associate Justice Kristina Pickering hereby recuses herself from this appeal.15-24561
08/14/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Voluntary Recusal. Associate Justice Ron D. Parraguirre hereby rucuses himself from this appeal.15-24562
08/18/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.15-24949
08/19/2015Order/IncomingFiled Executive Order. Judge James E. Wilson, Jr., appointed to sit in the place of Justice Ron Parraguirre.15-25119
08/19/2015Order/IncomingFiled Executive Order. Judge Jerry Polaha appointed to sit in the place of Justice Kristina Pickering.15-25120
08/27/2015Order/IncomingFiled Executive Order. Judge Dobrescu appointed to sit in the place of Judge Polaha for Justice Pickering.15-26097
08/28/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Filing Orders Granting Motions to Associate Counsel, David S. Krakoff, Esq., Benjamin B. Klubes, Esq., Joseph J. Reilly, Esq., and Adam Miller, Esq Pursuant to NRAP 46(a)(3)15-26124
09/01/2015Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision before the En Banc Court.
09/09/2015Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition for Writ of Prohibition or Mandamus and Vacating Stay. "We conclude that our extraordinary intervention is unwarranted, and we deny petitioner's request for writ relief." We vacate the stay imposed by our July 1, 2015, order. But because this writ petition raises important legal issues in need of clarification, an opinion in this matter will be forthcoming. fn1[1The Honorable James E. Wilson, Jr., District Judge in the First Judicial District Court, and the Honorable Steve L. Dobrescu, District Judge in the Seventh Judicial District Court, were designated by the Governor to sit in place of the Honorable Ron Parraguirre, Justice, and the Honorable Kristina Pickering, Justice, who voluntarily recused themselves from participation in the decision of this matter.] fn2[The clerk of this court is directed to stay issuance of the notice in lieu of remittitur pending our disposition of this matter by published opinion.]15-27290
10/15/2015Opinion/Non-DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Petition denied." Fn1[The Honorable James E. Wilson, Jr., District Judge in the First Judicial District Court, and the Honorable Steve L. Dobrescu, District Judge in the Seventh Judicial District Court, were designated by the Governor to sit in place of the Honorable Ron Parraguirre, Justice, and the Honorable Kristina Pickeirng, Justice, who voluntarily recused themselves from participation in the decision of this matter.] Before the Court En Banc. Author: Hardesty, C.J. Majority: Hardesty/Douglas/Cherry/Saitta/Gibbons/Wilson/Dobrescu. 131 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 83. EN BANC15-31345
11/09/2015RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur.15-34115
11/09/2015Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.