Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 68338
Short Caption:JEFFRIES (MICHAEL) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C279451Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:04/13/2017 at 10:30 AMOral Argument Location:Las Vegas
Submission Date:04/13/2017How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/01/2015Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
07/01/2015Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)15-20137
07/21/2015Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 3/23/15, 3/24/15, 3/25/15, 3/26/15, 4/14/15 and 5/27/15. To Court Reporter: Susan Dolorino.15-21969
07/22/2015Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement - Criminal Appeal.15-22149
08/07/2015Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Court Reporter Amber Riggio's Certificate of Delivery of Transcripts due: September 14, 2015.15-23940
09/18/2015TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Amber M. Raiggio stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 3/23/15, 3/24/15, 3/25/15, 3/26/15, 4/14/15 and 5/27/15.15-28314
10/16/2015MotionFiled Appellant Michael Joseph Jeffries' Motion for Extension of Time Within Which to File Opening Brief.15-31589
10/23/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Opening Brief and Appendix due: January 27, 2016.15-32433
01/25/2016MotionFiled Appellant Michael Joseph Jeffries' Motion for Enlargement of Time Within Which to File Opening Brief (Second Request).16-02525
02/03/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's opening brief and appendix due: February 10, 2016.16-03736
02/11/2016BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.16-04482
02/11/2016AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 1.16-04483
02/11/2016AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 2.16-04485
02/11/2016AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 3.16-04486
03/14/2016MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time - First Request (Answering Brief).16-08005
03/21/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Answering Brief due: April 28, 2016.16-08843
04/28/2016MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time - Second Request (Answering Brief).16-13405
05/11/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Answering Brief due: June 1, 2016.16-14758
06/01/2016MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time - Third Request (Answering Brief).16-17070
06/20/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file the answering brief received on June 13, 2016. Reply Brief due: 30 days.16-19212
06/20/2016BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.16-19213
07/01/2016MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Release Pending Appeal.16-20670
07/01/2016MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Imposition of Sanctions Against Respondent State of Nevada.16-20671
07/05/2016MotionFiled Opposition to Motion for Release Pending Appeal.16-20829
07/05/2016MotionFiled Opposition to Motion for Imposition of Sanctions.16-20830
07/06/2016MotionFiled Appellant's Reply in Support of Motion for Imposition of Sanctions Against Respondent State of Nevada.16-20943
07/06/2016MotionFiled Appellant's Reply in Support of Motion for Release Pending Appeal.16-20981
07/21/2016BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.16-22681
07/21/2016Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
07/27/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion for Sanctions.16-23351
08/09/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Appellant has filed a motion for release pending appeal. We deny the motion.16-24670
09/08/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting Appeal for Decision Without Oral Argument.16-27933
09/21/2016MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Reconsider Submission for Decision Without Oral Argument.16-29241
10/12/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion for Reconsideration. No cause appearing, appellant's motion for reconsideration of the order submitting this appeal for decision without oral argument is denied at this time.16-31765
11/08/2016BriefFiled Appellant Michael Joseph Jeffries' Notice of Supplemental Authorities.16-34822
11/21/2016BriefFiled Appellant Michael Joseph Jeffries' Second Notice of Supplemental Authorities.16-36177
11/21/2016BriefFiled Appellant Michael Joseph Jeffries' Corrected Second Notice of Supplemental Authorities.16-36257
02/28/2017Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This court has determined that oral argument may be of assistance in resolving this matter. Accordingly, this matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar.17-06868
03/01/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Thursday, April 13, 2017, at 10:30 a.m. for 30 minutes in Las Vegas.17-07054
03/29/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.17-10460
04/13/2017Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the Southern Panel. SNP17 - MD/MG/KP
07/06/2017Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before: Douglas/Gibbons/Pickering. Author: Douglas, J. Majority: Douglas/Gibbons/Pickering. 133 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 47. SNP17-MD/MG/KP17-22230
07/25/2017Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant Michael Joseph Jeffries' Petition for Rehearing of Panel Order of Affirmance.17-24589
07/31/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer to Petition for Rehearing. Answer due: 15 days.17-25230
08/15/2017MotionFiled Respondent's Motion for Extension of Time - First Request (Answer to Petition for Rehearing).17-27303
08/18/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent's Answer to Petition for Rehearing due: 30 days.17-27783
09/15/2017Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Answer to Petition for Rehearing.17-31250
09/29/2017Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c).17-33158
10/16/2017Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant Michael Joseph Jeffreies' Petition for Reconsideration En Banc (Petition for En Banc Reconsideration).17-35179
11/29/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer To Petition For En Banc Reconsideration. Answer due: 15 days.17-41078
12/14/2017Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Respondent's Answer to Petition for En Banc Reconsideration.17-43214
01/18/2018Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. Having considered the petition on file herein, we have concluded that en banc reconsideration is not warranted. NRAP 40A. Accordingly, we "ORDER the petition DENIED." Cherry, J., dissenting. EN BANC18-02584
02/12/2018RemittiturIssued Remittitur.18-05678
02/12/2018Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/09/2018RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on February 22, 2018.18-05678