Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Combined Case Information: 68346
Short Caption:ILIESCU, JR. VS. STEPPANCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):60036, 76146
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0700341Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:07/09/2015 / Clark, J.SP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:01/03/2017 at 11:30 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:01/03/2017How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/02/2015Filing FeeFiling fee due for Appeal. Filing fee will be forwarded by the District Court.
07/02/2015Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)15-20271
07/02/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed.15-20273
07/08/2015Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Albright, Stoddard, Warnick &Albright. Check No. 30009.
07/09/2015Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: J. Douglas Clark.15-20838
07/16/2015Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.15-21532
07/16/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge (Docketing Statement).15-21535
07/16/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Certificate of Service of Docketing Statement.15-21553
07/23/2015Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for August 25, 2015.15-22321
08/06/2015MotionFiled Appellants' Motion for Stay of Execution of Judgment or Foreclosure of Mechanic's Lien Pending this Appeal, Without the Necessity of Posting Any Further Security.15-23785
08/07/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Certificate of Service - Appellants' Motion for stay of Execution of Judgment or Foreclosure of Mechanic's Lien Pending this Appeal, Without the Necessity of Posting Any Further Security served on Settlement Judge.15-23830
08/17/2015MotionFiled Opposition to Appellants' Motion for Stay of Execution of Judgment or Foreclosure of Mechanic's Lien Pending This Appeal, Without the Necessity of Posting Any Security.15-24845
08/17/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Certificate of Service - Opposition to Appellants' Motion for Stay of Execution of Judgment or Foreclosure of Mechanic's Lien Pending This Appeal, Without the Necessity of Posting Any Security.15-24846
08/24/2015MotionFiled Reply Points & Authorities in Support of Appellants' Mtn for Stay of Execution of Judgment or Foreclosure of Mechanic's Lien Pending This Appeal, Without the Necessity of Posting Any Further Security.15-25571
08/27/2015Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: 9/10/15 @ 9:00 a.m.15-26055
10/19/2015Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter.15-31820
10/23/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion for Stay Without Posting any Further Security and Order to Show Cause. Appellant's Response due: 30 days.15-32337
11/19/2015MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause.15-35456
12/23/2015Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental.15-39493
01/13/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Dismissing Appeal in Part and Reinstating Briefing. We dismiss this appeal as to the May 27, 2015, order denying the motion to alter or amend. This appeal may proceed as to the February 26, 2015, order. Transcript Request Form due: 11 days. Opening Brief and Appendix due: 120 days.16-01101
01/25/2016Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request.16-02540
02/04/2016Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service Appellants' Addendum to Certificate Regarding Trial Transcripts16-03753
02/04/2016Notice/IncomingFiled Certificate of Service of Appellants' Addendum to Certificate Regarding Trial Transcripts.16-03771
05/12/2016AppendixFiled Appendix to Appellants' Opening Brief - Volume 1.16-15027
05/12/2016AppendixFiled Appendix to Appellants' Opening Brief - Volume 2.16-15028
05/12/2016AppendixFiled Appendix to Appellants' Opening Brief - Volume 3.16-15031
05/12/2016AppendixFiled Appendix to Appellants' Opening Brief - Volumes 4-6.16-15032
05/12/2016AppendixFiled Appendix to Appellants' Opening Brief - Volume 8.16-15033
05/12/2016AppendixFiled Appendix to Appellants' Opening Brief - Volume 9.16-15034
05/12/2016AppendixFiled Appendix to Appellants' Opening Brief - Volumes 10-11.16-15035
05/13/2016BriefFiled Appellants' Opening Brief.16-15078
05/13/2016AppendixFiled Appendix to Appellants' Opening Brief - Volume 7.16-15082
05/27/2016MotionFiled Stipulation to Continue Briefing Schedule16-16700
06/03/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Approving Stipulation. Respondents Answering Brief due: July 13, 2016. Appellants Reply Brief due: August 15, 2016.16-17373
07/01/2016Notice/IncomingFiled Errata to Rule 28.2 Certificate of Compliance; Motion to Allow Acceptance of 234 Word Extra-Long Brief, or Alternative Remedy; and Declaration of Counsel.16-20687
07/11/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellants have filed an errata to the certificate of compliance included with the opening brief. Counsel represents that the original certificate unintentionally understated the number of words in the brief and the actual word-count is 14,234 words, 234 over the limitation imposed by NRAP 32(a)(7)(A)(ii). Given that the opening brief has already been filed and the fact that it only exceeds the word limitation by 234 words, we continue to accept the brief. fn1[Counsel's alternative motion to strike the footnotes in order to meet the word-limitation is denied as moot.]16-21401
07/12/2016AppendixFiled Respondent's Supplemental Appendix, Volume 1.16-21621
07/12/2016AppendixFiled Respondent's Supplemental Appendix, Volume 2 part 1.16-21622
07/12/2016AppendixFiled Respondent's Supplemental Appendix, Volume 2 part 2.16-21646
07/12/2016AppendixFiled Respondent's Supplemental Appendix, Volume 3.16-21648
07/13/2016BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.16-21771
08/08/2016Notice/IncomingFiled Appellants' Supplement to Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement.16-24528
08/09/2016Notice/IncomingFiled Certificate of Service of Appellants' Supplement to Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement.16-24543
08/11/2016AppendixFiled Appellants' Supplemental Appendix Volume 12.16-24912
08/11/2016AppendixFiled Appellants' Supplemental Appendix Volume 12 Part 2.16-24930
08/11/2016AppendixFiled Appellants' Supplemental Appendix Volume 13.16-24932
08/11/2016AppendixFiled Appellants' Supplemental Appendix Volume 14.16-24933
08/11/2016AppendixFiled Appellants' Supplemental Appendix Volume 15.16-24934
08/11/2016AppendixFiled Appellants' Supplemental Appendix Volume 16.16-24935
08/11/2016AppendixFiled Appellants' Supplemental Appendix Volume 16 part 2.16-24947
08/11/2016AppendixFiled Appellants' Supplemental Appendix Volume 17.16-24958
08/11/2016AppendixFiled Appellants' Supplemental Appendix Volume 17 Part 2.16-24959
08/11/2016AppendixFiled Appellants' Supplemental Appendix Volume 18.16-24973
08/11/2016AppendixFiled Appellants' Supplemental Appendix Volume 18 Part 2.16-24975
08/11/2016AppendixFiled Appellants' Supplemental Appendix Volume 19.16-24976
08/11/2016AppendixFiled Appellants' Supplemental Appendix Volume 20.16-24977
08/11/2016BriefFiled Appellants' Reply Brief.16-24986
08/11/2016Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
11/23/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This court has determined that oral argument may be of assistance in resolving this matter. Accordingly, this matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar16-36568
11/28/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument.Argument is scheduled for Tuesday, January 3, 2017, at 11:30 a.m. for 30 minutes in Carson City.16-36746
12/21/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.16-39669
01/03/2017Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court.
05/25/2017Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Reversed and remanded." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Hardesty, J. Majority: Hardesty/Cherry/Douglas/Gibbons/Pickering/Parraguirre/Stiglich. 133 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 25. EN BANC17-17514
06/12/2017Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Respondent's Petition for Rehearing.17-19337
06/12/2017Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from Michael D. Hoy
07/25/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer to Petition for Rehearing. Answer due: 15 days.17-24583
08/09/2017Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellants' Answer to Petition for Rehearing.17-26435
09/05/2017MotionFiled Motion for Leave to File an Amicus Curiae Brief and for Extension of Time in Which to File.17-29721
09/07/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. The American Institute of Architects has filed an untimely motion for leave to file a brief of amicus curiae. No cause appearing, we deny the motion.17-30004
09/21/2017Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). Douglas, J., with whom Pickering, J., agrees, dissenting.17-32055
10/16/2017RemittiturIssued Remittitur.17-35243
10/16/2017Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/03/2017RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by the District Court Clerk on October 17, 2017.17-35243