The Supreme Court
of Nevada
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 68431
Short Caption:SATICOY BAY LLC SER. 2021 GRAY EAGLE WAY VS. JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A605965Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Disqualifications:Panel Assigned: Panel
Replacement:
To SP/Judge:09/17/2015 / Trost, JanetSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:11/01/2016How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/17/2015Filing FeeFiling fee due for Appeal.
07/17/2015Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.15-21663
07/17/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days.15-21673
08/11/2015Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. To date, appellant has not paid the filing fee or otherwise responded to this court's notice. Accordingly, cause appearing, "this appeal is dismissed."15-24150
08/11/2015Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for Rehearing.15-24221
08/11/2015Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from Michael F. Bohn.
09/16/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. This appeal was dismissed by way of clerk's order on August 11, 2015, for failure to pay the filing fee. Appellant has submitted a petition for rehearing, which the court elects to treat as a motion for reconsideration pursuant to IOP Rule 15(c). Having considered the motion, we have determined that relief is warranted. Accordingly, the motion for reconsideration is granted. The clerk of this court is directed to reinstate this appeal and to accept the filing fee previously tendered.15-28088
09/16/2015Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Law Office of Michael F. Bohn, check no. 14790. (Originally received on 8/24/15).
09/16/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed.15-28094
09/17/2015Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Janet Trost.15-28253
09/21/2015MotionFiled Motion for Reconsideration of Order Granting Motion for Reconsideration and Reinstating Appeal.15-28563
09/29/2015Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for 9/28/15 at 4:00 p.m.15-29537
09/30/2015Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter.15-29673
10/01/2015Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix.15-29827
10/01/2015MotionFiled Motion to permit the late filing of response to motion for reconsideration.15-29838
10/06/2015Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 4/16/15. To Court Reporter: Renee Vincent.15-30340
10/09/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Having considered the arguments made in respondent's motion for reconsideration of this court's September 16, 2015, Order Granting Motion for Reconsideration and Reinstating Appeal, the court hereby denies the motion. NRAP 27. fn1[Appellant's motion to file a response is granted. The clerk of this court is directed to file appellant's response, received on October 1, 2015.]15-30756
10/09/2015MotionFiled Response to Motion for Reconsideration of Order Granting Motion for Reconsideration and Reinstating Appeal.15-30757
10/12/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement. Due date: 10 days.15-31010
10/23/2015Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.15-32421
12/28/2015MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Time to File Appellant's Opening Brief.15-39739
01/05/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Approving Stipulation. Opening Brief and Appendix due: February 4, 2016.16-00200
02/04/2016MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Time to File Appellant's Opening Brief.16-03756
02/12/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant: Opening Brief and Appendix due: February 19, 2016.16-04761
02/19/2016BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.16-05442
02/19/2016AppendixFiled Joint Appendix.16-05443
03/24/2016BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.16-09408
04/25/2016MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Time to File Appellant's Reply Brief.16-12877
04/25/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Reply Brief due date: May 23, 2016.16-12881
05/24/2016BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.16-16241
05/25/2016Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
11/01/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting For Decision Without Oral Argument.16-33962
11/23/2016MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Oral Argument.16-36631
11/28/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion or Oral Argument.16-36766
01/26/2017Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Vacated and remanded with instructions." Before: Hardesty/Parraguirre/Pickering. Author: Hardesty, J. Majority: Hardesty/Parraguirre/Pickering. 133 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 3. SNP16P-RP/JH/KP17-02863
02/21/2017RemittiturIssued Remittitur.17-05996
02/21/2017Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/09/2017RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on February 28, 2017.17-05996