Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 68433
Short Caption:COMSTOCK RESIDENTS ASS'N. VS. LYON CNTY. BD. OF COMM'RS.Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):70738
Lower Court Case(s):Lyon Co. - Third Judicial District - 14-CV-00128Classification:Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:Exempt
Oral Argument:09/14/2016 at 10:00 AMOral Argument Location:The National Judicial College
Submission Date:09/14/2016How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/17/2015Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Comstock Residents Association. Check No. 1128.
07/17/2015Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)15-21700
07/17/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed.15-21702
07/20/2015Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Exemption from Settlement Program. It has been determined that this appeal will not be assigned to the settlement program. Appellants: 15 days transcript request form; 120 days opening brief:15-21788
08/03/2015Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.15-23298
09/16/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order to Comply with NRAP 9. Transcript Request Form due: 11 days.15-28024
09/25/2015Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request.15-29146
11/17/2015MotionFiled Stipulation for Extension to file Briefs.15-35016
11/17/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Opening Brief due date: December 7, 2015.15-35044
12/04/2015MotionFiled Request for Leave to File CD-DVDs.15-37012
12/09/2015BriefFiled Appellants' Opening Brief.15-37506
12/09/2015AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volumes 1-6.15-37507
12/09/2015AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volumes 7-11.15-37508
12/09/2015AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volumes 12-18.15-37509
12/09/2015AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volumes 18-22.15-37510
12/09/2015AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volumes 23-28.15-37511
12/22/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellants may include the CDs and DVDs in the joint appendix.15-39298
12/31/2015AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 29.15-40204
01/05/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On November 17, 2015, the parties filed a stipulation for an extension of time to file the opening brief and appendix and the answering brief. The stipulation is approved. The opening brief and appendix have been filed. Answering Brief due: January 28, 2016.16-00257
01/15/2016BriefFiled Respondents' Joint Answering Brief.16-01655
01/21/2016AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 30. (Compact Disc containing files on DCs and DVD filed with Record on Appeal (June 10, 2014/January 2, 205))16-02096
02/12/2016Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Reply Brief due: March 1, 2016.16-04689
03/02/2016BriefFiled Appellants CRA's Reply Brief.16-06746
03/02/2016Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
06/07/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This court has determined that oral argument may be of assistance in resolving this matter. Accordingly, this matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar.16-17650
08/11/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Wednesday, September 14, 2016, a 10:00 a.m. for 30 minutes at the National Judicial College.16-24948
09/01/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.16-27245
09/12/2016MotionFiled The National Judicial College Requests Permission to Bring a Still Camera in the Courtroom to Take Pictures of the Arguments.16-28314
09/13/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Media Request. Permission is granted for photographic or electronic media coverage of the court proceedings. Brady Johnson of The National Judicial College is designated as pool coordinator. All equipment necessary to allow for such photographic or electronic coverage of such proceedings shall be placed in the courtroom before 10:00 a.m.16-28330
09/14/2016Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the Northern Nevada Panel. NNP16-MC/MD/MG.
12/02/2016Order/DispositionalFiled Order Affirming in Part, Reversing in Part and Remanding. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED IN PART AND REVERSED IN PART AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." Cherry, J., concurring in part and dissenting in part. NNP16C-MC/MD/MG16-37327
12/20/2016Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Respondents' Joint Petition for Rehearing.16-39570
12/20/2016Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from Justin M. Townsend.
12/29/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer to Petition For Rehearing. Answer due: 15 days.16-40490
01/10/2017Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellants' Opposition to Joint Petition for Rehearing.17-00777
01/25/2017Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "We deny the petition for rehearing."17-02803
02/21/2017RemittiturIssued Remittitur.17-06014
02/21/2017Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/02/2017RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 23, 2017.17-06014