The Supreme Court
of Nevada
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 68434
Short Caption:MONA VS. DIST. CT. (FAR WEST INDUS.)Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus/Prohibition
Related Case(s):70857, 73815
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A670352Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Disqualifications:Panel Assigned: En Banc
Replacement:
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:07/06/2016 at 10:30 AMOral Argument Location:Regional Justice Center
Submission Date:07/06/2016How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/17/2015Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $250.00 from Micah S. Echols.
07/17/2015Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition.15-21714
07/17/2015MotionFiled Emergency Motion for Relief Under NRAP 27(e) (Relief needed by Monday, July 20, 2015).15-21716
07/17/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 1.15-21718
07/17/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 2.15-21719
07/20/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Temporary Stay. Petitioners have filed a motion to stay. We temporarily stay the July 15, 2015, order in Eighth Judicial District Court Case No. A-12-670352-F, as well as the proceedings below, pending further order of this court. Real party in interest shall file a response to the motion within 11 days from the date of this order.15-21827
07/29/2015MotionFiled Real Party In Interest Far West Industries' Motion to Exceed Page Limit Pursuant to NRAP 32(a)(7)(D).15-22911
07/29/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Declaration in Support of Real Party In Interest Far West Industries' Motion to Exceed Page Limit.15-22912
07/29/2015Notice/IncomingFiled NRAP 26.1 Disclosure.15-22913
08/11/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Intent to File Reply in Support of Emergency Motion for Relief Under NRAP 27(e).15-24200
08/14/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Real parties in interest's motion for leave to file a response to the motion for stay in excess of 10 pages is granted. The clerk of this court shall file the response received on July 29, 2015. Petitioner shall have 5 days from the date of this order to file a reply.15-24676
08/14/2015MotionFiled Response to Motion Opposition to Petitioners' Emergency Motion for Relief Under NRAP 27(E)15-24677
08/14/2015MotionFiled Emergency Motion for Relief Under NRAP 27(e). (Relief requested by 8/18/15).15-24685
08/24/2015MotionFiled Motion for Excess Pages Motion to Exceed Page Limit for Reply in Support of Emergency Motion for Relief Under NRAP 27 (e)15-25474
08/25/2015MotionFiled Motion to Exceed Page Limit for Petitioners' Opposition to Far West Industries' Emergency Motion for Relief Under NRAP 27(e).15-25824
08/31/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order. We stay all proceedings in Eighth Judicial District Court Case No. A-12-670352-F, pending further order of this court. We deny without prejudice real party in interest's request to require a bond and determine the amount of such a bond. Real party in interest has filed a motion to prevent petitioners from "transferring, disposing of or encumbering any non-exempt property while this [matter] remains pending. We deny the motion. Real Party in Interest's Answer due: 30 days. Petitioner shall have 15 days from service of the answer to file and serve any reply. fn1[We grant petitioners' motion to exceed the page limit for the reply in support of the stay motion and direct the clerk to file the reply received on August 24, 2015. fn3[We grant petitioners' motion to exceed the page limit for an opposition to a motion and direct the clerk to file the opposition received on August 25, 2015.15-26364
08/31/2015MotionFiled Reply in Support of Emergency Motion for Relief Under NRAP 27 (e). (FILED PER ORDER 8/31/15).15-26366
08/31/2015MotionFiled Petitioners' Opposition to Far West Industries' Emergency Motion for Relief Under NRAP 27(e). (FILED PER ORDER 8/31/15).15-26367
10/01/2015Petition/WritFiled Real Party In Interest's Answering Brief.15-29747
10/01/2015AppendixFiled Supplemental Appendix Volumes 1-2.15-29795
10/01/2015AppendixFiled Supplemental Appendix Volume 3.15-29796
10/01/2015AppendixFiled Supplemental Appendix Volume 4.15-29797
10/06/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Errata to Real Party in Interest's Supplemental Appendices.15-30281
10/09/2015Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Petitioner Michael J. Mona, Jr.'s Reply to Answer to Writ Petition due: November 2, 2015.15-30679
10/16/2015MotionFiled Petitioners' Emergency Motion for Relief Under NRAP 27(e).15-31455
10/16/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Errata to Emergency Motion for Relief Under NRAP 27(e) (Relief needed by Monday, October 19, 2015).15-31558
10/16/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order. We temporarily stay the requirement that petitioners post supersedeas bonds, pending this court's receipt and consideration of further briefing on the motion. Within 5 days from the date of this order, petitioners shall supplement the motion with a clear statement. Real party in interest shall have 11 days from service of petitioners' supplement to file a combined response to the motion and supplement, and petitioners shall have 3 days from service of the response to file a reply. Further, under our order of August 31, 2015, all proceedings in Eighth Judicial District Court Case No. A-12-670352-F remain stayed pending further order of this court.15-31639
10/26/2015MotionFiled Petitioners' Supplement to Emergency Motion for Relief Under NRAP 27(e). (In response to order filed on 10/16/15).15-32501
11/02/2015Petition/WritFiled Reply in Support of Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition.15-33166
11/04/2015MotionFiled Real Party In Interest Far West Industries' Motion to Exceed Page Limit Pursuant to NRAP32(a)(7)(D).15-33570
11/05/2015MotionFiled Petitioners' Limited Opposition to Far West Industries' Motion to Exceed Page Limit Pursuant to NRAP 32(a)(7)(D).15-33853
11/06/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file the opposition received on November 4, 2015. Petitioners shall have 3 days from the date of this order to file a reply of up to 10 pages.15-33917
11/06/2015MotionFiled Opposition to Petitioners' Emergency Motion for Relief Under NRAP 27(e) and Supplement to Emergency Motion for Relief Under NRAP 27(e). (FILED PER ORDER 11/06/2015).15-33918
11/13/2015MotionFiled Reply in Support of Emergency Motion for Relief Under NRAP 27(e).15-34615
11/19/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. We therefore deny petitioners' motion to extend the stay of proceedings without bond, or on conditions different from those ordered by the district court. This court's stay entered August 31, 2015, and temporary stay entered October 16, 2015, shall expire within 5 business days from the date of this order unless the parties comply with the bond requirements imposed by the district court in its written order of October 16, 2015, as a condition of any stay.15-35394
03/14/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Re: Scheduling Oral Argument. This court has determined that oral argument may be of assistance in resolving this matter. Accordingly, this matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar.16-07997
05/24/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for Wednesday, July 6, 2016, at 10:03 a.m. in Las Vegas for 30 minutes.16-16289
06/23/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.16-19707
07/06/2016Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court.
07/06/2016Notice/IncomingFiled Response to Oral Argument Question16-21033
09/29/2016Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Petition granted in part and denied in part." We direct the clerk of court to issue a writ of prohibition directing the district court to vacate the post-judgment sanctions order as to Rhonda and instructing the district court to conduct further proceedings consistent with this opinion. Before the Court En Banc. Author: Gibbons, J. Majority: Gibbons/Parraguirre/Hardesty/Douglas/Cherry/Pickering. Fn1[The Honorable Nancy M. Saitta, Justice, having retired, this matter was decided by a six-justice court.] 132 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 72. EN BANC16-30293
09/29/2016WritIssued Writ with letter. Original and one copy of writ and copy of the opinion mailed to Attorney Micah Echols for service upon Judge.16-30327
10/05/2016Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service of Writ of Prohibition (Writ served on Hon. Joseph Hardy on 10/03/16).16-30944
10/07/2016WritFiled Returned Writ. Original Writ returned. Served on Judge Joseph Hardy, Jr. on 10/03/16.16-31286
10/24/2016RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur.16-33169
10/24/2016Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/15/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter to Publishers regarding corrections on recently filed opinions. Nos. 68987/(61715/65819/66452)/66094/68434/(69611/70648)/(68523/68754/68770/68845)/(68949/68975)/69065/68033/69218 (Filed in Docket no. 68989, Document no. 17-05409)